EP3851664 - CRANKING PROCEDURE FOR A FOUR-STROKE INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH A CRANKSHAFT MOUNTED ELECTRIC TURNING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRP-Rotax GmbH & Co. KG Rotaxstrasse 1 4623 Gunskirchen / AT | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KILLINGSEDER, Lukas Oberaubach 15 4724 Eschenau im Hausruckkreis / AT | 02 /
FREUDENTHALER, Martin Dr.-Karl-Neuhauser-Strasse 16 4651 Stadl-Paura / AT | 03 /
BURGSTALLER, Alexander Schönauer Straße 6 4701 Bad Schallerbach / AT | 04 /
HOLLINGER, Philipp Ringweg 42 4210 Unterweitersdorf / AT | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 21152633.0 | 20.01.2021 | [2021/29] | Priority number, date | US202062963435P | 20.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062963435 P | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3851664 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F02N19/00 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
F02N19/005 (EP);
F02D41/062 (US);
F01L1/047 (US);
F02D41/009 (US);
F02D41/40 (US);
F02N11/0862 (US);
F01L2820/041 (US);
F02D2200/023 (US);
F02D2200/0414 (US);
F02D2200/70 (US);
F02N2019/007 (EP);
F02N2200/021 (EP);
F02N2200/023 (EP);
F02N2200/024 (EP);
F02N2200/122 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] |
Former [2021/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KURBELVORGANG FÜR EINEN VIERTAKT-VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR MIT EINER KURBELWELLENMONTIERTEN ELEKTRISCHEN DREHMASCHINE | [2021/29] | English: | CRANKING PROCEDURE FOR A FOUR-STROKE INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH A CRANKSHAFT MOUNTED ELECTRIC TURNING MACHINE | [2021/29] | French: | PROCÉDURE DE DÉMARRAGE D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE À QUATRE TEMPS AVEC UNE MACHINE DE TOURNAGE ÉLECTRIQUE À VILEBREQUIN | [2021/29] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 21.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2022 | Observations by third parties | 22.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000283012 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 5-7* paragraph [0087] *; | [XI]FR2805571 (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * [I] 14,15; | [X]EP1233175 (MITSUBA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,14,15 * figures 5, 9 *; | [X]JP2003184712 (KOKUSAN DENKI CO) [X] 1,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] *; | [XI]WO2009073951 (AZURE DYNAMICS INC [CA], et al) [X] 1 * figure 3 * * page 19, line 20 - page 21, line 13 * [I] 8,10,11,14,15; | [XI]DE102016205450 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,9,12 * paragraphs [0016] , [0030] - [0036] * [I] 5-7,13-15 |