EP3829100 - TRANSMISSION OF SRS USING MULTIPLE COMPONENT CARRIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICO ALVARINO, Alberto c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
GAAL, Peter c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Wanshi c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
XU, Hao c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
SUN, Jing c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 21152662.9 | 28.09.2017 | [2021/22] | Priority number, date | US201662402915P | 30.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662402915 P | US201715619094 | 09.06.2017 Original published format: US201715619094 | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3829100 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3829100 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W52/08, H04W52/32, H04W52/34, H04W52/36, H04W52/50 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
H04L5/001 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0096 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W52/346 (EP,CN);
H04W74/0833 (CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0048 (CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0051 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0092 (US);
H04W52/08 (EP,CN);
H04W52/325 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W52/34 (CN,KR,US);
H04W52/367 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG VON SRS MIT MEHREREN KOMPONENTENTRÄGERN | [2021/22] | English: | TRANSMISSION OF SRS USING MULTIPLE COMPONENT CARRIERS | [2021/22] | French: | TRANSMISSION DU SRS AVEC MULTIPLES PORTE-COMPOSANTS | [2021/22] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 22.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17784133.5 / EP3520296 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/27] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 06.12.2023 | |
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013156014 (KIM DONGCHEOL [KR], et al); |