EP3831628 - TARPAULIN RETRACTION AND EXTENSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fabrication Elcargo Inc. 6015 av. Raoul-Lassonde Saint-Hyacinthe, Quebec J2R 1E4 / CA | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROYER, Real 19oo St-Pierre Ouest app. 201 Saint-Hyacinthe, Quebec J2T1P5 / CA | 02 /
BOUTIN, Keven 535, Rue Des Appalaches Drummondville, Quebec J2E 0GB / CA | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Turner, Craig Robert, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [2024/20] |
Former [2021/23] | Turner, Craig Robert, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Octagon Point 5 Cheapside London EC2V 6AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 21152976.3 | 27.02.2019 | [2021/23] | Priority number, date | CA20182996958 | 01.03.2018 Original published format: CA 2996958 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3831628 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3831628 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/08 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
B60J7/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] |
Former [2021/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PLANENRÜCKZIEH- UND -ERWEITERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/23] | English: | TARPAULIN RETRACTION AND EXTENSION DEVICE | [2021/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EXTENSION ET DE RÉTRACTION DE BÂCHES | [2021/23] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 08.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19159728.5 / EP3533643 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2008217952 (ROYER REAL [CA]); | [Y]US2010230994 (ROYER REAL [CA]); | [Y]US2016332557 (ROYER REAL [CA]) | by applicant | US2002021018 | US6595594 | US7506912 |