EP3862300 - SYSTEM, APPARATUS, AND METHOD FOR DETECTING A FAULT IN A PUSHER SHOE OF A SHOE SORTATION CONVEYOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligrated Headquarters LLC 7901 Innovation Way Mason, OH 45040 / US | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAURBER, William M. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | 02 /
ROTH, Eric HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | 03 /
WIENEKE, Jacob D. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | 04 /
ZIMMER, Justin J. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | 05 /
RUGH, John Williams HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2024/20] |
Former [2021/32] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 21153115.7 | 22.01.2021 | [2021/32] | Priority number, date | US202016784489 | 07.02.2020 Original published format: US202016784489 | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3862300 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3862300 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65G43/02, B65G47/84 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
B65G47/844 (EP,US);
B07C3/065 (CN);
B65G43/06 (US);
B65G43/02 (EP,US);
B65G2203/0275 (US);
B65G2203/042 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERKENNEN EINES FEHLERS IN EINEM SCHUBSCHUH EINES SCHUHSORTIERFÖRDERERS | [2021/32] | English: | SYSTEM, APPARATUS, AND METHOD FOR DETECTING A FAULT IN A PUSHER SHOE OF A SHOE SORTATION CONVEYOR | [2021/32] | French: | SYSTÈME, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UN DÉFAUT DANS UN SABOT POUSSOIR D'UN CONVOYEUR DE TRIAGE À SABOTS | [2021/32] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 01.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24167229.4 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5135100 (COTTER DAVID H [US], et al); | [A]US5167315 (DOANE MARTIN R [US]); | [A]US2013220771 (SCHROADER STEVEN VANN [US]) | by applicant | US20080014922 |