EP3896450 - METHODS FOR DETERMINING DPP3 AND THERAPEUTIC METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 4TEEN4 Pharmaceuticals GmbH Neuendorfstrasse 15A 16761 Hennigsdorf / DE | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergmann, Andreas Am Rosenanger 78 13465 Berlin / DE | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Kilger, Ute Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 21153560.4 | 20.04.2017 | [2021/42] | Priority number, date | EP20160166476 | 21.04.2016 Original published format: EP 16166476 | [2021/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3896450 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/574, A61K39/395 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
A61P1/16 (EP,IL);
G01N33/6893 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (CH,IL);
G01N33/581 (IL,US);
A61P13/12 (EP,IL);
A61P17/02 (EP,IL);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P31/00 (EP,IL);
A61P31/04 (EP,IL);
A61P31/12 (EP,IL);
A61P31/18 (EP,IL);
A61P33/00 (EP,IL);
A61P33/06 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
A61P9/00 (EP,IL);
A61P9/02 (EP,IL);
A61P9/04 (EP,IL);
A61P9/10 (EP,IL);
C07K16/40 (EP,CH,IL,KR,US);
G01N33/53 (CH,IL);
G01N33/54306 (IL,US);
G01N33/574 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01N33/6854 (CH,IL,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/90 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01N2333/948 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01N2800/24 (IL,US);
G01N2800/26 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01N2800/325 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G01N2800/347 (EP,IL,KR,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON DPP3 UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERFAHREN | [2021/42] | English: | METHODS FOR DETERMINING DPP3 AND THERAPEUTIC METHODS | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR DÉTERMINER UN DPP3 ET PROCÉDÉS THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2021/42] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 20.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17720047.4 / EP3446125 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2005106486 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al); | [A]US2006177886 (HAZATO TADAHIKO [JP], et al); | by applicant | US4804676 | EP0353971 | WO9110741 | WO9117271 | WO9201047 | WO9220791 | WO9312227 | US5585089 | US5601986 | US5612186 | US5807715 | EP1266025 | US2004023334 | EP1498480 | WO2005040229 | WO2005106486 | US2006177886 | EP1941867 | US2010028995 | WO2010060748 | EP2231860 | US2011008805 | WO2011023685 | EP2314308 | WO2011073214 | WO2011154420 |