EP3858712 - VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Ikuma c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
KATOH, Satoshi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
IRIE, Ryo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 21153582.8 | 26.01.2021 | [2021/31] | Priority number, date | JP20200015726 | 31.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020015726 | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3858712 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62D15/02, G01M17/007, G05D1/02 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
B62D15/025 (EP,BR);
B60W10/06 (RU);
B60W60/0023 (KR);
B60W60/00 (CN);
B62D15/021 (US);
B60R16/033 (KR);
B60W10/184 (RU);
B60W10/20 (CN,KR);
B60W30/16 (RU);
B60W30/182 (US);
B60W40/00 (RU);
B60W40/08 (RU);
B60W40/105 (KR,RU);
B60W40/107 (KR);
B60W50/12 (US);
B60W60/001 (US);
G05D1/0005 (KR);
G08G1/00 (RU);
B60W2050/0002 (KR);
B60W2510/0638 (US);
B60W2510/205 (US);
B60W2520/10 (KR);
B60W2540/18 (KR);
B60W2710/207 (CN);
Y02T10/70 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG | [2021/31] | English: | VEHICLE | [2021/31] | French: | VÉHICULE | [2021/31] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 01.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.03.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2016313735 (BERKEMEIER MATTHEW D [US]); | [YA]US2016377508 (PERRONE PAUL J [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2018132015 | JP2020015726 |