EP4036085 - COMPOUNDS FOR OPTICALLY ACTIVE OPHTHALMIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMO Ireland Block B, Liffey Valley Office Campus Quarryvale Dublin / IE | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 21153841.8 | 27.01.2021 | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4036085 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/16, A61P27/02, A61L27/16, C07D311/42, C08F220/30, C07F7/18 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
C07D311/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/303 (US);
A61P27/02 (EP,KR);
C07D311/42 (EP,KR);
C07D327/08 (US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,KR);
C08F220/1804 (US);
C08F220/281 (US);
C08F220/30 (EP,KR);
C08L33/06 (EP,KR);
A61L2430/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2800/10 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/16, C08L33/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN FÜR OPTISCH AKTIVE OPHTHALMOLOGISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2022/31] | English: | COMPOUNDS FOR OPTICALLY ACTIVE OPHTHALMIC DEVICES | [2022/31] | French: | COMPOSES POUR DISPOSITIFS OPHTALMIQUES OPTIQUEMENT ACTIFS | [2022/31] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.01.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2009074520 (ACRI TEC GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-18* claims 1-24 *; | [AD]WO2017032444 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-18 * claims 1-24 *; | [A] - SKOWRONSKI L. ET AL, "Optical properties of coumarins containing copolymers", OPTICAL MATERIALS, NL, (20150901), vol. 47, doi:10.1016/j.optmat.2015.06.047, ISSN 0925-3467, pages 18 - 23, XP055812203 [A] 1-18 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.optmat.2015.06.047 | [A] - KORCHIA LAETITIA ET AL, "UV-responsive amphiphilic graft copolymers based on coumarin and polyoxazoline", SOFT MATTER, (20170101), vol. 13, no. 25, doi:10.1039/C7SM00682A, ISSN 1744-683X, pages 4507 - 4519, XP055812195 [A] 1-18 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C7SM00682A | by applicant | US5290892 | US5331073 | WO9610049 | US5587444 | US5693095 | JPH1174077 | WO2007033831 | JP2009099253 | WO2009074520 | WO2009074521 | WO2010049044 | US2010324165 | WO2012097858 | WO2012167124 | US2013033975 | US2014356788 | US2016018737 | WO2017032442 | WO2017032443 | WO2017032444 | US2017081532 | US2017306121 | WO2018149850 | WO2018149852 | WO2018149853 | WO2018149855 | WO2018149856 | WO2018149857 | WO2019121642 | - M. SCHRAUB et al., European Polymer Journal, (20140000), vol. 51, pages 21 - 27 | - PATEL, M.P. et al., Biomaterials, (19870000), vol. 8, pages 53 - 56 | - S. HELMSTETTER et al., J Polym Res, (20160000), vol. 23, page 249 | - C. E. WHEELOCK, J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19590000), vol. 81, no. 6, pages 1348 - 1352 | - K. MUTHURAMUV. RAMAMURTHY, Ind. J. Chem. B, (19840000), vol. 23B, no. 6, pages 502 - 508 | - J. TRAGER et al., Macromolecular Bioscience, (20080000), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 177 - 183 | - M. SCHRAUBN. HAMPP, "Proc. Of SPIE", Ophthalmic Technologies XXI, (20110000), page 7885 | - K. TIETZ et al., Macromol. Chem. Phys., (20140000), vol. 215, no. 16, pages 1563 - 1572 | - PAC, (19960000), vol. 68, page 2291 | - A. MIYATAS. YAGUCHI, J Cataract Refract Surg, (20040000), vol. 30, pages 1768 - 1772 | - BOZUKOVA DPAGNOULLE CJEROME RJEROME C, "Polymers in modern ophthalmic implants -Historical background and recent advances", Material Science and Engineering R, (20100000), vol. 69, pages 63 - 83, XP027189262 |