EP3865865 - X-RAY PHASE-CONTRAST DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2023/13] |
Former [2021/33] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIEDMANN, Uwe General Electric Company Global Research One Research Circle, Building K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
JACOB, Biju General Electric Company Global Research One Research Circle, Building K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 03 /
EDIC, Peter Michael General Electric Company Global Research One Research Circle, Building K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 04 /
YANOFF, Brian David General Electric Company Global Research One Research Circle, Building K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Fennell, Gareth Charles Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 21154088.5 | 28.01.2021 | [2021/33] | Priority number, date | US202016789100 | 12.02.2020 Original published format: US202016789100 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3865865 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3865865 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3865865 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/041, A61B6/00, G01T1/20, G01T1/24 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
G01N23/041 (EP,US);
A61B6/40 (CN);
A61B6/4233 (EP,US);
A61B6/06 (CN);
A61B6/42 (CN);
A61B6/4291 (EP);
A61B6/44 (CN);
A61B6/484 (EP,US);
G01T1/20184 (US);
G01T1/241 (EP,US);
G01T1/247 (US);
G01N2223/064 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | RÖNTGENPHASENKONTRASTDETEKTOR | [2021/33] | English: | X-RAY PHASE-CONTRAST DETECTOR | [2021/33] | French: | DÉTECTEUR À CONTRASTE DE PHASE AUX RAYONS X | [2021/33] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 27.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | IT | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | LU | 28.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
IT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SI | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
IT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SI | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010246765 (MURAKOSHI DAI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-12,15 * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0160]; figures 10-20 * * paragraphs [0006] , [ 0079] , [ 0080] *; | [XI]EP2633813 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10-12,15 * paragraphs [0046] , [ 0054] - paragraph [0065]; figures 1, 5 * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0077]; figures 6, 7 * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0099]; figures 9-11 * * paragraph [0167] - paragraph [0173]; figure 22 * [I] 3,9; | [X]US2015323679 (YANG MING-HUAN [TW], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0033] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1A-1C * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0074]; figure 8 *; | [X]US2018226168 (PROKSA ROLAND [DE]) [X] 1,5-8,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [ 0006] , [ 0051] , [ 0062] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1, 2 *; | [X]EP3447538 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 5-8,10,13-15* paragraphs [0005] , [ 0007] , [ 0011] , [ 0062] - paragraph [0087]; figures 3-5 *; | [A]US2019304616 (KOEHLER THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-4,7-12,15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0072]; figures 6-10 * |