EP3834702 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TISSUE CONTACT DETECTION AND FOR AUTO-EXPOSURE AND ILLUMINATION CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHMOND, Geoff 2994 Casa Nueva Ct. San Jose, CA California 95124 / US | 02 /
DICARLO, Jeffrey 4611 Edgemont Dr. Austin, TX Texas 78731 / US | 03 /
HOFFMAN, Brian D. 365 Kenzo Ct. Mountain View, CA California 94040 / US | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 21154425.9 | 17.03.2015 | [2021/24] | Priority number, date | US201461954336P | 17.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461954336 P | US201461954381P | 17.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461954381 P | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3834702 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B34/30, A61B90/30 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B1/00006 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/00009 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/00055 (EP,KR);
A61B1/00062 (US);
A61B1/00165 (KR,US);
A61B1/00193 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/045 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/06 (EP,US);
A61B1/0655 (EP,KR,US);
A61B34/35 (KR);
A61B90/30 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2034/301 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2090/065 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2090/0801 (US);
A61B2090/08021 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] |
Former [2021/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEWEBEKONTAKTDETEKTION UND ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN BELICHTUNGS- UND BELEUCHTUNGSSTEUERUNG | [2021/24] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TISSUE CONTACT DETECTION AND FOR AUTO-EXPOSURE AND ILLUMINATION CONTROL | [2021/24] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DÉTECTION D'UN CONTACT AVEC UN TISSU ET POUR LA COMMANDE D'UNE AUTO-EXPOSITION ET D'UN ÉCLAIRAGE | [2021/24] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 09.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15764341.2 / EP3119318 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5469840 (TANII YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2001056238 (TSUJITA KAZUHIRO [JP]); | [A]US2011273548 (UCHIYAMA AKIO [JP], et al) | by applicant | US6331181 | US6511422 | US8512232 | US20070762165 |