EP4037283 - CONTROLLER AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING A BALANCED CONNECTIVITY OPTIMUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kornbichler, Andreas 83623 Dietramszell / DE | 02 /
Riedl, Johannes 84030 Ergolding / DE | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 21154625.4 | 01.02.2021 | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4037283 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
H04L67/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANPASSUNG EINES AUSGEGLICHENEN VERBINDUNGSOPTIMUMS | [2022/31] | English: | CONTROLLER AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING A BALANCED CONNECTIVITY OPTIMUM | [2022/31] | French: | ORGANE DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE D'UNE CONNECTIVITÉ ÉQUILIBRÉE OPTIMALE | [2022/31] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/28] | 24.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009274045 (MEIER JOHN L [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0057] * [I] 8; | [A]US2012023190 (BACKHOLM ARI [FI], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0091] ** paragraph [0128] *; | [A]US2019132219 (GANDHI DHIRAJ PRAMOD [US]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0067] * * figure 3 * |