EP3865419 - COVER MADE OF PAPER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebrüder Leonhardt GmbH & Co. KG Blema Kircheis Erdmann-Kircheis-Str. 13-15 08280 Aue / DE | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leonhardt, Sebastian Hoher Weg 4c 08231 Zschorlau / DE | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Rumrich, Gabriele Patentanwältin Limbacher Strasse 305 09116 Chemnitz / DE | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 21154816.9 | 02.02.2021 | [2021/33] | Priority number, date | DE202010103806 | 13.02.2020 Original published format: DE102020103806 | [2021/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3865419 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3865419 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65D43/02 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
B65D43/0222 (EP);
B65D43/0214 (US);
B65D2543/00027 (US);
B65D2543/00092 (EP,US);
B65D2543/0024 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00268 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] |
Former [2021/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DECKEL AUS PAPIER SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2021/33] | English: | COVER MADE OF PAPER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SAME | [2021/33] | French: | COUVERCLE EN PAPIER, AINSI QUE SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/33] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 07.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2021/33] | 15.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 15.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 19.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 19.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 19.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 19.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 28.09.2023 | |
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 28.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3434651 (STEC FREDERICK J) [Y] 4,6* column 2, line 43 - line 44; figure 4 *; | [YA]US2010176130 (KIM YEONG LEUL [KR]) [Y] 4,6 * figures 2,3; claim 1 * [A] 1,5 | by applicant | DE830891 | EP2674369 | US2014144923 |