EP3916095 - ANTISENSE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ionis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | [2021/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SWAYZE, Eric E. Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | [2021/48] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2021/48] | Application number, filing date | 21155022.3 | 18.10.2007 | [2021/48] | Priority number, date | US200685289406P | 18.10.2006 Original published format: US 85289406 P | [2021/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3916095 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/712 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
A61K31/712 (EP,US);
A61K31/7125 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/321 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3231 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3341 (EP,US);
C12N2310/341 (EP,US);
C12N2310/346 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3525 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2022/27] |
Former [2021/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANTISENSE-VERBINDUNGEN | [2021/48] | English: | ANTISENSE COMPOUNDS | [2021/48] | French: | COMPOSÉS ANTISENS | [2021/48] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 31.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 31.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07844422.1 / EP2092065 | EP11186203.3 / EP2410054 | EP16205317.7 / EP3202905 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 31.08.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 31.08.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.09.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004069991 (SANTARIS PHARMA AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005023825 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US2005153921 (MONIA BRETT P [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [L]WO2012109395 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [L] 1-12* the whole document *; | [I] - FLUITER K ET AL, "ON THE IN VITRO AND IN VIVO PROPERTIES OF FOUR LOCKED NUCLEIC ACID NUCLEOTIDES INCORPORATED INTO AN ANTI-H-RAS ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDE", CHEMBIOCHEM - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, WILEY VCH, WEINHEIM, DE, (20050606), vol. 6, no. 6, ISSN 1439-4227, pages 1104 - 1109, XP009069506 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.200400419 | [A] - W. F. LIMA ET AL, "The Positional Influence of the Helical Geometry of the Heteroduplex Substrate on Human RNase H1 Catalysis", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, US, (20061006), vol. 71, no. 1, doi:10.1124/mol.106.025429, ISSN 0026-895X, pages 73 - 82, XP055225537 [A] 1-12 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/mol.106.025429 | by applicant | US4981957 | US5118800 | WO9324510 | US5319080 | WO9414226 | US5359044 | WO9426764 | US5393878 | US5446137 | US5466786 | US5514785 | US5519134 | US5567811 | US5576427 | US5591722 | US5597909 | US5610300 | US5627053 | US5639873 | US5646265 | US5658873 | US5670633 | US5700920 | US5792747 | WO9839352 | WO9914226 | US6268490 | US6525191 | US2003082807 | US6600032 | US2003207841 | US6670461 | US2004014959 | US2004143114 | US6770748 | US2004171570 | US6794499 | US2004219565 | WO2005021570 | WO2005121371 | US7034133 | US7053207 | WO2007090071 | - BELIKOVA et al., Tet. Lett., (19670000), vol. 37, pages 3557 - 3562 | - ZAMECNIK et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19780000), vol. 75, pages 280 - 284 | - MANOHARAN et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (19940000), vol. 4, page 1053 | - KABANOV et al., FEBS Lett., (19900000), vol. 259, page 327 | - LETSINGER et al., "86", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), page 6553 | - BERGER et al., Nuc Acid Res, (20000000), vol. 28, pages 2911 - 14 | - ALBAEK et al., J. Org. Chem., (20060000), vol. 71, pages 7731 - 7740 | - FLUITER et al., Chembiochem, (20050000), vol. 6, pages 1104 - 1109 | - SINGH et al., "4", Chem. Commun., (19980000), pages 455 - 456 | - KOSHKIN et al., Tetrahedron, (19980000), vol. 54, pages 3607 - 3630 | - WAHLESTEDT et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U. S. A., (20000000), vol. 97, pages 5633 - 5638 | - KUMAR et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (19980000), vol. 8, pages 2219 - 2222 | - SINGH et al., J. Org. Chem., (19980000), vol. 63, pages 10035 - 10039 | - ELAYADI et al., "2", Curr. Opinion Invens. Drugs, (20010000), pages 558 - 561 | - BRAASCH et al., Chem. Biol., (20010000), vol. 8, pages 1 - 7 | - ORUM et al., Curr. Opinion Mol. Ther., (20010000), vol. 3, pages 239 - 243 | - SINGH et al., Chem. Commun., (19980000), vol. 4, pages 455 - 456 | - MORITA et al., Bioorganic Medicinal Chemistry, (20030000), vol. 11, pages 2211 - 2226 | - FRIEDEN et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (20030000), vol. 21, pages 6365 - 6372 | - MANOHARAN et al., Ann. N.Y. Acad. Sci., (19920000), vol. 660, page 306 | - MANOHARAN et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Let., (19930000), vol. 3, page 2765 | - OBERHAUSER et al., "20", Nucl. Acids Res., (19920000), page 533 | - SAISON-BEHMOARAS et al., EMBO J., (19910000), vol. 10, page 111 | - SVINARCHUK et al., Biochimie, (19930000), vol. 75, page 49 | - MANOHARAN et al., Tetrahedron Lett., (19950000), vol. 36, page 3651 | - SHEA et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19900000), vol. 18, page 3777 | - MANOHARAN et al., Nucleosides & Nucleotides, (19950000), vol. 14, page 969 | - MISHRA et al., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (19950000), vol. 1264, page 229 | - CROOKE et al., J. Pharmacol. Exp. Ther., (19960000), vol. 277, page 923 | - FREIER et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19970000), vol. 25, no. 22, pages 4429 - 4443 | - SCARINGE, Methods, (20010000), vol. 23, pages 206 - 217 | - GAIT et al., Applications of Chemically synthesized RNA in RNA: Protein Interactions, (19980000), vol. 1-36 | - GALLO et al., Tetrahedron, (20010000), vol. 57, pages 5707 - 5713 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. U92437.1 |