Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.05.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
06.05.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
06.05.2022 | Change - designated states | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
03.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.10.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] |
21.05.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.02.2021 | Change - representative |