EP3854924 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/30] | FIBER-MODIFIED INTERLAYER FOR A COMPOSITE STRUCTURE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE | ||
[2023/07] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR, LV, NO, PL, RS, SE | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2021/30] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSOTSIS, Thomas K C/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | 02 /
SPRENGARD, Joseph E C/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 21155190.8 | 30.11.2017 | [2021/30] | Priority number, date | US201615373769 | 09.12.2016 Original published format: US201615373769 | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3854924 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3854924 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D04H5/08, D04H5/02, B29C70/08, B29C70/50, // B29C70/34, B29K301/12, B29K307/04, B29L31/30 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
B29C70/081 (EP,KR,US);
B29C70/16 (BR);
B32B5/022 (CN,KR,US);
B29C70/30 (EP,BR,CN,US);
B29C70/34 (EP,BR,KR,US);
B29C70/50 (EP,KR,US);
B32B33/00 (CN);
B32B37/04 (KR,US);
B32B37/06 (CN);
B32B37/10 (BR,CN);
B32B37/203 (KR,US);
B32B38/08 (KR,US);
B32B38/1808 (KR,US);
B32B5/06 (CN,KR);
B32B5/08 (KR,US);
B32B5/10 (KR);
B32B5/12 (KR,US);
B32B5/26 (CN,KR,US);
D04H1/4242 (KR,US);
D04H1/4374 (KR,US);
D04H3/00 (CN);
D04H3/14 (KR,US);
D04H5/02 (EP,US);
D04H5/08 (EP,KR,US);
D06B3/10 (KR,US);
B29K2301/12 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2307/04 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2995/0005 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2995/0089 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2995/0091 (EP,KR,US);
B29L2031/30 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3076 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2038/0076 (KR,US);
B32B2038/008 (KR,US);
B32B2255/02 (CN);
B32B2255/10 (CN);
B32B2255/20 (CN);
B32B2255/26 (CN);
B32B2260/023 (KR,US);
B32B2260/046 (BR);
B32B2262/02 (US);
B32B2262/0215 (KR);
B32B2262/0253 (CN);
B32B2262/0261 (CN);
B32B2262/0269 (CN);
B32B2262/0276 (CN);
B32B2262/0284 (CN);
B32B2262/0292 (CN);
B32B2262/101 (CN);
B32B2262/106 (CN,KR,US);
B32B2262/14 (KR,US);
B32B2305/08 (KR,US);
B32B2305/20 (KR,US);
B32B2305/72 (KR,US);
B32B2307/202 (CN,KR,US);
B32B2307/558 (CN,KR,US);
B32B2307/56 (KR,US);
B32B2313/04 (KR,US);
B32B2398/20 (KR,US);
B32B2605/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] |
Former [2021/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EINER VERBUNDSTRUKTUR | [2023/07] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE STRUCTURE | [2023/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION D'UNE STRUCTURE COMPOSITE | [2023/07] |
Former [2021/30] | FASERMODIFIZIERTE ZWISCHENSCHICHT FÜR EINE VERBUNDSTRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2021/30] | FIBER-MODIFIED INTERLAYER FOR A COMPOSITE STRUCTURE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE | ||
Former [2021/30] | COUCHE INTERCALAIRE MODIFIÉE PAR DES FIBRES POUR UNE STRUCTURE COMPOSITE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Examination procedure | 20.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 20.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17204797.9 / EP3333293 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5286553 (HARAGUCHI KEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * example 1 *; | [A]JPH07173754 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0001] , [0003]; figure 1; example 1 *; | [A]WO9922059 (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 3, 4; claim 1 *; | [A]US2005059309 (TSOTSIS THOMAS KARL [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure -; claim - *; | [XAI]CN105200539 (NAT UNIV DONG HWA) [X] 1,4-6,8-11 * claims 5,6 * [A] 15 [I] 2,3,7,12-14; | [A]EP3002355 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] , [0108] , [0109]; figure 6 * |