EP3886012 - IMPROVED UTILIZATION OF A FLEET OF UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLES FOR DELIVERY OF GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | For all designated states Sony Europe B.V. The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPJUTH, Pär Östanbäcksvägen 29 247 33 Södra Sandby / SE | 02 /
ISBERG, Anders Alnarpsvägen 26 232 53 Åkarp / SE | 03 /
BERGKVIST, Hannes Hönögatan 10 257 31 Rydebäck / SE | 04 /
EXNER, Peter Per Ols Väg 14 237 37 Bjärred / SE | 05 /
LEE, Shaun 2 Wrights Close, South Wonston Winchester, Hampshire SO21 3HD / GB | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Neij & Lindberg AB Pedellgatan 11 224 60 Lund / SE | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 21155367.2 | 05.02.2021 | [2021/39] | Priority number, date | SE20200050343 | 27.03.2020 Original published format: SE 2050343 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3886012 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP);
G06Q10/08 (US);
G06Q10/06314 (US);
G06Q10/0835 (US);
G06Q10/08355 (US);
G08G5/0043 (US);
B64U2101/60 (EP,US);
B64U2201/102 (US);
B64U2201/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] |
Former [2021/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE NUTZUNG EINER FLOTTE VON UNBEMANNTEN LUFTFAHRZEUGEN ZUR AUSLIEFERUNG VON WAREN | [2021/39] | English: | IMPROVED UTILIZATION OF A FLEET OF UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLES FOR DELIVERY OF GOODS | [2021/39] | French: | UTILISATION AMÉLIORÉE D'UNE FLOTTE DE VÉHICULES AÉRIENS SANS PILOTE POUR LA LIVRAISON DE MARCHANDISES | [2021/39] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2021/39] | 10.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 10.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 22.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.03.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 22.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.03.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US9262929 (ROY NICK [US], et al); | [I]US2017090484 (OBAIDI AHMAD ARASH [US]); | [I]US2019126769 (SCHMALZRIED JIM [US], et al); | [I]US2019197643 (COCHRAN THERAN [US], et al) | by applicant | US2019114564 |