EP4039725 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYETHER CARBONATE ALCOHOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Aurel 42489 Wülfrath / DE | 02 /
Schuetze, Mike 51379 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Sebastian, Marina 53507 Dernau / DE | 04 /
Guertler, Christoph 50735 Köln / DE | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 21155431.6 | 05.02.2021 | [2022/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4039725 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08G64/30, C08G65/26 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
C08G64/30 (EP);
C08G65/2603 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYETHERCARBONATALKOHOLEN | [2022/32] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYETHER CARBONATE ALCOHOLS | [2022/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ALCOOLS POLYÉTHERCARBONATE | [2022/32] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/43] | 06.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/43] | 12.04.2023 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 05.07.2023 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request rejected | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016001206 (COVESTRO DEUTSCHLAND AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * example 1 * * page 1 * * page 2 * * page 9 * * page 18 *; | [A] - ROBERT F. HARRIS, "Structural features of poly(alkylene ether carbonate) diol oligomers by capillary gas chromatography", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, US, (19890105), vol. 37, no. 1, doi:10.1002/app.1989.070370114, ISSN 0021-8995, pages 183 - 200, XP055622074 [A] 1-15 * page 184; example Sample 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.1989.070370114 | by applicant | EP0343572 | EP1359177 | - R.F. HARRIS, Journal of Applied Polymer Science, (19890000), vol. 37, pages 183 - 200 | EP20190192407 | EP20190192409 |