EP3838066 - BRUSH WITH ALTERNATE ROWS OF ANGLED TUFTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWIMC LLC 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, OH 44115 / US | [2022/35] |
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states SWIMC LLC 101 West Prospect Avenue Cleveland, OH 44115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBERTSON, Michael C. Aurora, OH 44202 / US | 02 /
BUCKEL, Charles T. Valley City, OH 44280 / US | 03 /
DE RENZO, Dennis P. Concord Township, OH 44077 / US | [2022/35] |
Former [2021/25] | 01 /
LAMBERTSON, Michael C. Bryce Avenue Aurora, oh Ohio 1241 / US | ||
02 /
BUCKEL, Charles T. Abbeyville Road Valley City, OH Ohio 1877 / US | |||
03 /
DE RENZO, Dennis P. Stonewycke Drive Concord Township, OH Ohio 10912 / US | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [2022/35] |
Former [2021/25] | Siepmann, Felix, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastraße 17 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21155518.0 | 24.06.2011 | [2021/25] | Priority number, date | US201035869310P | 25.06.2010 Original published format: US 35869310 P | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3838066 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3838066 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/02, A46B9/06 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
A46B9/02 (EP,CN,US);
A46B9/025 (EP,CN,US);
A46B9/06 (EP,CN,US);
A46B2200/3093 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] |
Former [2021/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BÜRSTE MIT ABWECHSELNDEN REIHEN VON ABGEWINKELTEN BÜSCHELN | [2021/25] | English: | BRUSH WITH ALTERNATE ROWS OF ANGLED TUFTS | [2021/25] | French: | BROSSE À RANGÉES ALTERNÉES DE TOUFFES INCLINÉES | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 12.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11733717.0 / EP2584932 | EP19171296.7 / EP3536190 | Divisional application(s) | EP22188505.6 / EP4101339 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.08.2022 | AT | 31.08.2022 | CZ | 31.08.2022 | DK | 31.08.2022 | EE | 31.08.2022 | ES | 31.08.2022 | FI | 31.08.2022 | HR | 31.08.2022 | IT | 31.08.2022 | LT | 31.08.2022 | LV | 31.08.2022 | MC | 31.08.2022 | PL | 31.08.2022 | RO | 31.08.2022 | RS | 31.08.2022 | SE | 31.08.2022 | SI | 31.08.2022 | SK | 31.08.2022 | SM | 31.08.2022 | NO | 30.11.2022 | GR | 01.12.2022 | IS | 31.12.2022 | PT | 02.01.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3722020 (HILLS J) [A] 1-5* figure - *; | [A]EP0221000 (NICOLAS YVON MARCEL) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-4, 7 *; | [A]WO0025631 (TRISA HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1-5 * figure - *; | [A]WO0189344 (GILLETTE CANADA [CA], et al) [A] 1-5 * figure 4 *; | [A]US2005268414 (KIM DOUGJOHN [US]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0026] - [0029]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2007116115 (SAJAKORPI OY [FI], et al) [A] 6 * figure -; claims 5, 8 *; | [A]WO2010069919 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALT [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 12, line 23 - page 15, line 24; figures 12-17 * | by applicant | US19930613586 |