EP4039818 - METHOD FOR PROGNOSING THE COURSE OF A SARS-COV-2 INFECTION AND THE RESPONSE TO A SARS-COV-2 IMMUNIZATION AND/OR NATURAL INFECTION BY MEASURING SOLUBLE ACE2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Delbrück-Centrum für Molekulare Medizin in der Helmholtz-Gemeinschaft Robert-Rössle-Straße 10 13125 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Charité - Universitätsmedizin Berlin Charitéplatz 1 10117 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/32] | For all designated states Max-Delbrück-Centrum für Molekulare Medizin in der Helmholtz-Gemeinschaft Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | ||
For all designated states Charité - Universitätsmedizin Berlin Charitéplatz 1 10117 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De la Rosa, Kathrin 10437 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Lebedin, Mikhail 16321 Bernau / DE | 03 /
Sander, Leif 14169 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Kurth, Florian 10555 Berlin / DE | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/32] | Kador & Partner PartG mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21155584.2 | 05.02.2021 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4039818 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/37, G01N33/566, G01N33/68 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
C12Q1/37 (EP);
G01N33/566 (EP);
G01N33/6893 (EP);
G01N2800/26 (EP);
G01N2800/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PROGNOSE DES VERLAUFS EINER SARS-COV-2-INFEKTION UND DER REAKTION AUF EINE SARS-COV-2-IMMUNISIERUNG UND/ODER AUF EINE NATÜRLICHE INFEKTION DURCH MESSUNG VON LÖSLICHEM ACE2 | [2022/32] | English: | METHOD FOR PROGNOSING THE COURSE OF A SARS-COV-2 INFECTION AND THE RESPONSE TO A SARS-COV-2 IMMUNIZATION AND/OR NATURAL INFECTION BY MEASURING SOLUBLE ACE2 | [2022/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRONOSTIC DE L'ÉVOLUTION D'UNE INFECTION AU SARS-COV-2 ET DE LA RÉPONSE À UNE IMMUNISATION CONTRE LE SARS-COV-2 OU À UNE INFECTION NATURELLE EN MESURANT LA QUANTITÉ D`ACE2 SOLUBLE | [2022/32] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/29] | 03.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN112017782 (BEIJING SONGGUOTIANMU HEALTH MAN CO LTD) [X] 8 * abstract; Fig. 1; Description *; | [X] - RICE GILLIAN I. ET AL, "Circulating Activities of Angiotensin-Converting Enzyme, Its Homolog, Angiotensin-Converting Enzyme 2, and Neprilysin in a Family Study", HYPERTENSION, US, (20061101), vol. 48, no. 5, doi:10.1161/01.HYP.0000244543.91937.79, ISSN 0194-911X, pages 914 - 920, XP055820382 [X] 1-4,13,15 * p. 915, par.: "Assays" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.HYP.0000244543.91937.79 | [ ] - Rice Gillian I ET AL, "Supplementary Information_Circulating Activities of Angiotensin Converting Enzyme (ACE), its Homolog ACE2 and Neprilysin in a Family Study", (20061101), URL: https://www.ahajournals.org/doi/suppl/10.1161/01.HYP.0000244543.91937.79, (20210701), XP055820424 [ ] * par.: "Assays" * | [X] - Xiao Fengxia ET AL, "Measurement of Angiotensin Converting Enzyme 2 Activity in Biological Fluid (ACE2) : Methods and Protocols", Hypertension : Methods and Protocols, Humana Press, (20170101), vol. 1527, pages 101 - 115, doi:10.1007/978-1-4939-6625-7_8, ISSN 1064-3745, XP055820414 [X] 1-4,13,15 * p. 102-103, par.: 2 Materials; p. 102-107, par. 3 Methods; p. 110-111 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-1-4939-6625-7_8 | [X] - ÚRI KATALIN ET AL, "New Perspectives in the Renin-Angiotensin-Aldosterone System (RAAS) IV: Circulating ACE2 as a Biomarker of Systolic Dysfunction in Human Hypertension and Heart Failure", PLOS ONE, vol. 9, no. 4, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0087845, (20140401), pages e87845 - ] e87845, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC3972189/pdf/pone.0087845.pdf, XP055820690 [X] 1-4,13,15 * p. 3, par.: "Measurement of serum ACE2 activity" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0087845 | [X] - KATALIN URI ET AL, "Circulating ACE2 activity correlates with cardiovascular disease development", JOURNAL OF THE RENIN-ANGIOTENSIN-ALDOSTERONE SYSTEM., (20161212), pages 1 - 11, URL: https://journals.sagepub.com/doi/pdf/10.1177/1470320316668435, XP055820680 [X] 1-4,13,15 * p. 3, par.: Measurement of serum ACE2 activity * | [X] - NAGY BÉLA ET AL, "A dramatic rise in serum ACE2 activity in a critically ill COVID-19 patient", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR INFECTIOUS DISEASES, HAMILTON, CA, vol. 103, doi:10.1016/J.IJID.2020.11.184, ISSN 1201-9712, (20201126), pages 412 - 414, (20201126), XP086488977 [X] 1-4,8,13,15,16 * p. 413, co. 2; abstract; p. 414 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijid.2020.11.184 | [X] - Anonymous, "Mca-APK(Dnp) - BML-P163 - Enzo Life Sciences", (20170125), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://www.enzolifesciences.com/BML-P163/mca-apk-dnp/, (20210702), XP055820671 [X] 13,15 * the whole document * | [X] - LI WENHUI ET AL, "Angiotensin-converting enzyme 2 is a functional receptor for the SARS coronavirus", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD., ETC, LONDON, (20031101), vol. 426, no. 6965, doi:10.1038/NATURE02145, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 450 - 454, XP037065772 [X] 5-7,14,15 * p. 453, co. 2, par.: Immunoprecipitation and identification of ACE2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature02145 | [X] - Lier D.P.T. Van ET AL, "Increased blood angiotensin converting enzyme 2 activity in critically ill COVID-19 patients", ERJ open research, England, doi:10.1183/23120541.00848-2020, (20210128), page 848, URL: https://openres.ersjournals.com/content/erjor/early/2021/01/21/23120541.00848-2020.full.pdf, (20210921), XP055842962 [X] 8-12,16 * par.: "Methods"; fig. 1; par.: "Discussion" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1183/23120541.00848-2020 | [A] - BENTON DONALD J ET AL, "Receptor binding and priming of the spike protein of SARS-CoV-2 for membrane fusion", NATURE, (20201220), vol. 588, no. 7837, doi:10.1038/S41586-020-2772-0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 327 - 330, XP037313512 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41586-020-2772-0 | by applicant | - ELASED, K.M.CUNHA, T.S.GURLEY, S.B.COFFMAN, T.M.MORRIS, M., "New mass spectrometric assay for angiotensin-converting enzyme 2 activity", Hypertension, (20060000), vol. 47, pages 1010 - 1017 | - PICCOLI, L.PARK, Y.-J.TORTORICI, M.A.CZUDNOCHOWSKI, N.WALLS, A.C.BELTRAMELLO, M.SILACCI-FREGNI, C.PINTO, D.ROSEN, L.E.BOWEN, J.E., "Mapping Neutralizing and Immunodominant Sites on the SARS-CoV-2 Spike Receptor-Binding Domain by Structure-Guided High-Resolution Serology", Cell, (20200000), vol. 183, pages 1024 - 1042 | - PINTO, D.PARK, Y.-J.BELTRAMELLO, M.WALLS, A.C.TORTORICI, M.A.BIANCHI, S.JACONI, S.CULAP, K.ZATTA, F.DE MARCO, A., "Cross-neutralization of SARS-CoV-2 by a human monoclonal SARS-CoV antibody", Nature, (20200000), vol. 583, doi:10.1038/s41586-020-2349-y, pages 290 - 295, XP037289888 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41586-020-2349-y |