EP4039216 - INSTRUMENT HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metal Aarschot NV Dubbeekstraat 112 3200 Aarschot / BE | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thijs, Tom 3200 Aarschot / BE | 02 /
Thijs, André 3200 Aarschot / BE | 03 /
Thijs, Andy 3200 Aarschot / BE | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 21155596.6 | 05.02.2021 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4039216 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/30, A61B90/50, A61B90/00 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
A61B90/03 (EP);
A61B90/50 (EP);
A61B2090/034 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSTRUMENTENHALTER | [2022/32] | English: | INSTRUMENT HOLDER | [2022/32] | French: | SUPPORT D'INSTRUMENT | [2022/32] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/29] | 03.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0699053 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2004122446 (SOLAR MATTHEW S [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8,10-15 * figure 7 *; | [X]US9498297 (YOUSEF BASEM FAYEZ [AE]) [X] 1-4,6-15 * figures 1,3 * * column 4, lines 55-66 * * column 9, lines 30-55 *; | [XDI]EP3294187 (THYS TOM [BE], et al) [XD] 1-6,8,11-15 * figures 1,3,4 * * paragraph [0020] * [I] 9 | by applicant | EP3294187 |