EP4040200 - MICRO-LENS BASED MODULE COMPRISING NANOSTRUCTURED LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focuslight Switzerland SA Rouges-Terres 61 2068 Hauterive / CH | [2024/14] |
Former [2022/32] | For all designated states SUSS MicroOptics SA Rouges-Terres 61 2068 Hauterive / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quaranta, Giorgio 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 02 /
Noell, Wilfried 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 03 /
Bremer, Christopher 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 21155756.6 | 08.02.2021 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4040200 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/18, G01B11/25, G02B27/20, G03B21/00 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
G02B5/1842 (EP,KR);
G02B3/0056 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/20 (EP,KR);
G02B27/425 (EP,KR);
G02B5/008 (EP,KR);
G02B5/1809 (US);
G02B5/1814 (EP,KR);
G02B5/201 (EP,KR);
G02B5/28 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] |
Former [2022/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | 09.02.2023 | MD | Not yet paid | TN | 09.02.2023 | Title | German: | MIKROLINSENBASIERTES MODUL MIT NANOSTRUKTURIERTER SCHICHT | [2022/32] | English: | MICRO-LENS BASED MODULE COMPRISING NANOSTRUCTURED LAYER | [2022/32] | French: | MODULE À MICROLENTILLES COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE NANOSTRUCTURÉE | [2022/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 09.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6381072 (BURGER ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract; figures 2,2a,7c,20 * * column 2, line 43 - line 50 * * column 3, line 7 - line 20 * * column 15, line 59 - column 16, line 9 * * column 20, line 57 - column 21, line 21 * * column 21, line 50 - line 62 * * column 25, line 34 - column 26, line 57 * * column 29, line 6 - line 34 * [Y] 3,4,6-8,16 [I] 9,10; | [XY]US2012092623 (HUEBNER KENNETH J [US]) [X] 1,2,5,14-16 * paragraphs [0114] , [0169]; figures 15-18,61a-61c,63 * * paragraphs [0110] - [0116] - [0169] - [0173] - [0329] * [Y] 6-8,11-13,16; | [XY]US2019041736 (GRUNNET-JEPSEN ANDERS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract; figure 6d * * paragraphs [0039] , [0048] , [0060] , [0061] * [Y] 3,6-8; | [XYI]US2019270403 (SOBECKI JUSTIN E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,14,15 * abstract; figures 2,13 * * paragraphs [0039] - [0042] - [0046] , [0047] , [0060] , [0069]; claim 3 * [Y] 3,6-8,12,13,16 [I] 16; | [Y]US2020050094 (HAN SEUNGHOON [KR], et al) [Y] 3,4,6-8,11-13 * abstract; figures 1-5,12,13 ** paragraphs [0065] - [0082] - [0094] , [0102] , [0110] , [0124] * | by applicant | US2011228231 | WO2019223859 |