EP4040119 - ROTOR BLADE MONITORING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernhammer, Lars Oliver 9400 Nørresundby / DK | 02 /
Fremmelev, Mads Anker 9000 Aalborg / DK | 03 /
Ladpli, Purim 9530 Støvring / DK | 04 /
Orlowitz, Esben 7200 Grindsted / DK | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/32] | Aspacher, Karl-Georg Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21155897.8 | 09.02.2021 | [2022/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4040119 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01H1/00, G01M7/00 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
G01M5/0033 (EP);
G01H1/006 (EP);
G01M5/0016 (EP);
G01M5/0066 (EP);
G01M7/00 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTORBLATT-ÜBERWACHUNGSANORDNUNG | [2022/32] | English: | ROTOR BLADE MONITORING ARRANGEMENT | [2022/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DES PALES DE ROTOR | [2022/32] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/32] | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005092087 (KURT-ELLI HILMI [GB]) [A] 7,13-15 * abstract ** figures 4, 9 *; | [A]EP2275795 (ATA ENGINEERING INC [US]) [A] 7,13-15 * abstract * * figures 1, 7 *; | [XI]WO2016012372 (BRÜEL & KJÆR SOUND & VIBRATION MEASUREMENT AS [DK]) [X] 1,2,4,8-12 * abstract * * page 6, lines 22-24 * * page 8, lines 9-13 * * page 13, lines 17, 18 * * page 16, lines 4-6 * * page 17, line 29 - page 18, line 18 * * figures 1, 6, 7 * [I] 3,5-7,13-15 |