EP3848401 - ISOTACTIC PROPYLENE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | First examination report | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANICH, Jo Ann M. 15710 Mesa Verde Drive Houston, TX Texas 77059 / US | 02 /
JIANG, Peijun 119 Mariner Cove Court League City, TX Texas 77573 / US | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 21155912.5 | 08.07.2014 | [2021/28] | Priority number, date | US201361847464P | 17.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361847464 P | US201361847442P | 17.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361847442 P | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848401 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/06, C08F4/6592 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
C08F10/06 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (US);
C08F110/06 (US);
C08F210/02 (US);
C08F210/06 (US);
C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08F4/65927 (US);
C08F2420/09 (EP);
C08F4/65908 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F110/06, C08F4/65927 (US,EP);
C08F210/06, C08F4/65927, C08F210/02 (US);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/03 (US);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/28, C08F2500/29 (EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/02 (US);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/03 (US);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/28, C08F2500/29 (EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/28, C08F2500/29 (EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Title | German: | ISOTAKTISCHE PROPYLENPOLYMERE | [2021/28] | English: | ISOTACTIC PROPYLENE POLYMERS | [2021/28] | French: | POLYMÈRES DE PROPYLÈNE ISOTACTIQUE | [2021/28] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 11.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14826133.2 / EP3022236 | EP17200794.0 / EP3301119 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO2009155471 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al); | [X]US2012245311 (CROWTHER DONNA J [US], et al); | [X]JP2013100558 (JAPAN POLYPROPYLENE CORP) | by applicant | EP0277003 | EP0277004 | US4814540 | US5008204 | US5041584 | US5066741 | EP0495375 | US5153157 | EP0520732 | WO9303093 | US5198401 | US5206197 | US5241025 | EP0570982 | WO9407928 | US5384299 | WO9514044 | US5447895 | US5453410 | US5502124 | US5504172 | EP0500944 | WO9843983 | EP0573120 | US5942459 | US6022929 | US6175409 | US6225432 | US6260407 | US6294388 | US6406632 | US6436292 | US6454947 | US6461515 | US6475391 | US6491816 | US6491823 | US2004054086 | US6897261 | JP2005336092 | US7297653 | WO2009155471 | US7799879 | WO2012134715 | WO2012134719 | WO2012134720 | US19940285380 |