EP3889915 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING VIRTUAL AVATAR, DEVICE, MEDIUM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Baidu Netcom Science and Technology Co., Ltd. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | For all designated states Beijing Baidu Netcom Science and Technology Co., Ltd. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LONG, Xiang 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
LI, Xin 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Henan 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | 04 /
SUN, Hao 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 21155927.3 | 09.02.2021 | [2021/40] | Priority number, date | CN202010156571 | 09.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010156571 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3889915 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3889915 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T13/40, G06T19/20 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
G06T19/20 (EP,US);
G06T13/40 (EP,KR,US);
G06T3/04 (CN);
G06N3/045 (EP,CN,US);
G06N3/047 (EP);
G06N3/08 (EP);
G06T17/00 (CN);
G06T19/003 (KR);
G06V40/20 (KR);
G06N3/006 (EP);
G06T2207/20084 (KR);
G06T2219/2004 (US);
G06T2219/2021 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/40] | G06T19/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES VIRTUELLEN AVATARS, VORRICHTUNG, MEDIUM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2021/40] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING VIRTUAL AVATAR, DEVICE, MEDIUM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2021/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR GÉNÉRER UN AVATAR VIRTUEL, DISPOSITIF, SUPPORT ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2021/40] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 22.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.04.2024 | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/31] | 22.03.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/31] | 10.04.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CN109978996 (BEIJING DAJIA INTERCONNECTION INFORMATION TECH CO LTD); | [A]US2019266775 (LEE WOOYONG [KR], et al); | [XY]CN110288680 (UNRE SHANGHAI INF TECH CO LTD); |