EP3868984 - LEVER GEAR FOR A DRIVE ROD FITTING CONCEALED IN A REBATE SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aug. Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG August-Winkhaus-Strasse 31 48291 Telgte / DE | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niehues, Stefan Neuwarendorf 71 48231 Warendorf / DE | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 21155996.8 | 09.02.2021 | [2021/34] | Priority number, date | DE202010202191 | 20.02.2020 Original published format: DE102020202191 | [2021/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3868984 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3868984 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E05B5/02, E05B13/00, E05C7/04 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
E05C7/045 (EP);
E05B13/002 (EP);
E05B5/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] |
Former [2021/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HEBELGETRIEBE FÜR EINEN IN EINER FALZLUFT VERDECKT ANGEORDNETEN TREIBSTANGENBESCHLAG | [2021/34] | English: | LEVER GEAR FOR A DRIVE ROD FITTING CONCEALED IN A REBATE SPACE | [2021/34] | French: | LEVIER DE COMMANDE D'UN RACCORD DE BARRE DE TRACTION DISSIMULÉ DANS UN JEU DE FEUILLURE | [2021/34] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 31.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees GR, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 31.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.04.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 31.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.04.2022 | Decision despatched |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | NL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SE | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | IE | 09.02.2023 | LU | 09.02.2023 | NO | 04.04.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
IE | 09.02.2023 | ||
LU | 09.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
LU | 09.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
LU | 09.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 04.01.2023 | |
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | FI | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 04.01.2023 | |
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 04.01.2023 | |
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 04.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE20201808U (SIEGENIA AUBI KG [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * page 5, line 23 - page 10, line 26; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE202006008969U (HEINRICH STRENGER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0007] , [ 0037] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-5 *; | [AD]EP1790804 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * paragraphs [0005] , [ 0013] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE20201808U | EP1790804 |