EP3868549 - TREAD RUBBER FORMING METHOD AND TREAD RUBBER FORMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SI | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken 651-0072 / JP | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONIMATSU, Hiroyuki c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 21156321.8 | 10.02.2021 | [2021/34] | Priority number, date | JP20200025491 | 18.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020025491 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3868549 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3868549 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/60, B60C11/00, B60C19/08, // B29D30/52 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
B29D30/60 (EP);
B60C11/0041 (CN);
B29D30/52 (EP);
B60C11/005 (EP);
B60C19/082 (EP);
B29D2030/526 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/34] | B29D30/60, B60C11/00, // B29D30/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] |
Former [2021/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FORMEN VON LAUFFLÄCHENGUMMI UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FORMEN VON LAUFFLÄCHENGUMMI | [2021/34] | English: | TREAD RUBBER FORMING METHOD AND TREAD RUBBER FORMING DEVICE | [2021/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION DE CAOUTCHOUC DE BANDE DE ROULEMENT | [2021/34] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 31.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2024
08.01.2024
ADMISSIBLE VMI Holland B.V. Gelriaweg 16 8161 RK Epe / NL Opponent's representative Melchior, Robin Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | [2024/07] | 19.01.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.05.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.04.2023 | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | ES | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | IT | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | NL | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/10] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 05.04.2023 | |
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 05.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2468490 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO [JP]); | [A]EP2487051 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO [JP]); | [A]EP2572902 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO [JP]) | by applicant | JP2005035337 | Opposition | JP2001047525 | EP1106335 | EP1175992 | JP2002046194 | WO02060676 | EP1358998 | EP1645442 | JP2007260962 | JP4070504B | EP2013007 | JP2010115935 | JP2010158838 | EP2230105 | US2010326588 | EP2468490 | EP2487051 | JP2013035218 | EP2572902 | JP2013079049 | EP2418104 | JP2016088029 | JP2017113994 | WO2018122754 | JP2005035337 |