EP4042937 - MEDICAL ELECTRODE HOLDER, SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kroener-Straße 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moissl, Ulrich 61184 Karben / DE | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Bobbert & Partner Patentanwälte PartmbB Postfach 1252 85422 Erding / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 21156357.2 | 10.02.2021 | [2022/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042937 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/33] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP4042937 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0537, A61B5/22, A61B5/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A61B5/0537 (EP);
A61B5/225 (EP);
A61B5/6895 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] |
Former [2022/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHER ELEKTRODENTRAEGER, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2022/33] | English: | MEDICAL ELECTRODE HOLDER, SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2022/33] | French: | PORTE-ÉLECTRODE MÉDICALE, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ | [2022/33] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 14.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JP2000023934 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,11,14 * the whole document * [A] 4,8,10,12 [I] 13,15; | [X]WO2007129521 (OMRON HEALTHCARE CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,11,14 * figures 1-3,,7,10-15 *; | [XI]US2012172747 (FUKUDA HIROAKI [IN], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7,11 * figures 2,6 * [I] 13-15; | [XAI]US2018028810 (SCHWARZ PHILIPP G [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,11 * paragraphs [0021] , [0030] , [0035] , [0036]; figures 1,10,11 * [A] 2,4,5,8,10,12 [I] 9,13-15; | [XAI]US2018036531 (SCHWARZ PHILIPP G [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11,14 * paragraphs [0015] - [0017] - [0029] , [0049] , [0056] , [0290] , [0293] , [0298] , [0305] , [0309]; figures 1,5,14; claims 1,6 * [A] 8,12 [I] 13,15; | [Y]US2018168530 (WEAR JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 12* paragraph [0026]; figure 1 *; | [XAYI]DE202019100532U (GOLDENSUNDA TECH CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11,14 * figures 1-5,10 * [A] 4,10 [Y] 12 [I] 13,15; | [XYI]US2020178873 (PALO MATTI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,11 * paragraph [0043]; figures 1,9 * [Y] 12 [I] 13,14; | [XAI]CN111481199 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6,8,11,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 4,10,12 [I] 5,9,13 | by applicant | US5830137 | WO2010022933 |