EP3865902 - TIME-OF-FLIGHT DETECTION PIXELS AND PIXEL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensors Unlimited, Inc. 330 Carter Road, Suite 100 Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIOBE, John 19 Stuyvesant Oval, Apt. 6B New York, NY New York 10009 / US | 02 /
ZHU, Rui 38 Maidenhead Road Princeton, NJ New Jersey 08540 / US | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 21156613.8 | 11.02.2021 | [2021/33] | Priority number, date | US202016790520 | 13.02.2020 Original published format: US202016790520 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3865902 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/4865, G01S7/487, G01S17/14, G01S17/894, H04N5/335 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
G01S17/14 (EP);
G01S17/894 (EP,CN);
G01S7/4873 (EP,US);
G01S17/10 (CN,US);
G01S17/89 (US);
G01S7/4861 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] |
Former [2021/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIXEL UND PIXELSYSTEME MIT LAUFZEITDETEKTION | [2021/33] | English: | TIME-OF-FLIGHT DETECTION PIXELS AND PIXEL SYSTEMS | [2021/33] | French: | PIXELS DE DÉTECTION À TEMPS DE VOL ET SYSTÈMES DE PIXELS | [2021/33] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 18.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2512125 (SEMI CONDUCTOR DEVICES AN ELBIT SYSTEMS RAFAEL PARTNERSHIP [IL]); | [XA]US2015116695 (BARTOLOME EDUARDO [US], et al) |