EP3868700 - TRAVEL CONTROL DEVICE FOR VEHICLE WITH AN AERIAL WORK PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Aichi Corporation 1152-10 Aza Yamashita Oaza Ryoke Ageo-shi Saitama 362-8550 / JP | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Mitsuru KABUSHIKI KAISHA AICHI CORPORATION c/o 1152-10, Aza Yamashita, Oaza Ryoke Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-8550 / JP | 02 /
AOKI, Takuya KABUSHIKI KAISHA AICHI CORPORATION c/o 1152-10, Aza Yamashita, Oaza Ryoke Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-8550 / JP | 03 /
YAEGASHI, Kou KABUSHIKI KAISHA AICHI CORPORATION c/o 1152-10, Aza Yamashita, Oaza Ryoke Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-8550 / JP | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 21156932.2 | 12.02.2021 | [2021/34] | Priority number, date | JP20200025334 | 18.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020025334 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3868700 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3868700 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/075, B66F9/22, B66F11/04, B66F17/00 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
B66F11/046 (EP);
B66F17/006 (EP);
B66F9/07568 (EP);
B66F9/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] |
Former [2021/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FAHRSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUG MIT EINER HUBARBEITSBÜHNE | [2021/34] | English: | TRAVEL CONTROL DEVICE FOR VEHICLE WITH AN AERIAL WORK PLATFORM | [2021/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE DÉPLACEMENT POUR VÉHICULE DOTÉ D'UNE PLATEFORME DE TRAVAIL AÉRIENNE | [2021/34] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 25.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007144817 (BINEV BINIO [DE], et al) [A] 1-5* paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0028]; figure 1 *; | [YA]US2011224872 (REED DAVID [US]) [Y] 1-3,5 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-6 * [A] 4; | [YA]WO2018162882 (NIFTYLIFT LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-3,5 * page 13, line 23 - page 14, line 13; figures 1,13 * [A] 4 | by applicant | JP2001180899 |