EP4043193 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A SPECTACLE LENS AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING MANUFACTURING TOOLS FOR MANUFACTURING SPECTACLE LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH Turnstrasse 27 73430 Aalen / DE | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUNGER, Dieter 73457 Essingen / DE | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | PATERIS Patentanwälte PartmbB Danckelmannstraße 9 14059 Berlin / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 21157052.8 | 15.02.2021 | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4043193 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00, G02C7/02 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
B29D11/00009 (EP);
B29D11/00326 (EP);
B29D11/00932 (EP);
G02C7/022 (EP);
G02C2202/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BRILLENGLASES UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON HERSTELLUNGSWERKZEUGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BRILLENGLÄSERN | [2022/33] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A SPECTACLE LENS AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING MANUFACTURING TOOLS FOR MANUFACTURING SPECTACLE LENSES | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN VERRE DE LUNETTES ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'OUTILS DE FABRICATION DE VERRES DE LUNETTES | [2022/33] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/31] | 13.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP3542956 (ZEISS CARL VISION INT GMBH [DE]); | [AD]WO2020014613 (SIGHTGLASS VISION INC [US]); | [A]WO2020180817 (SIGHTGLASS VISION INC [US]) | by applicant | DE3145278 | DE3406393 | US4606747 | DE10237880 | US2004130790 | WO2005055891 | WO2007092853 | US7373744 | WO2010025829 | WO2010075319 | EP2878989 | WO2017108871 | WO2018026697 | EP3312662 | WO2019152438 | EP3527385 | EP3542956 | EP3543003 | WO2020014613 |