EP3851429 - A PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF CRISABOROLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLON S.p.A. Strada Rivoltana Km. 6/7 20090 Rodano (MI) / IT | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SADA, Mara Via B. Cellini, 20 20090 SEGRATE (MI) / IT | 02 /
BERTOLINI, Giorgio c/o OLON S.p.A. Strada Rivoltana, Km 6/7 20090 RODANO (MI) / IT | 03 /
FELICIANI, Lazzaro c/o OLON S.p.A. Via Livelli, 1 - Fraz. Mairano 26852 CASALETTO LODIGIANO (LO) / IT | 04 /
GASSA, Federico c/o OLON S.p.A. Via Livelli, 1 - Fraz. Mairano 26852 CASALETTO LODIGIANO (LO) / IT | 05 /
MAZZA, Alberto c/o OLON S.p.A. Via Livelli, 1 - Fraz. Mairano 26852 CASALETTO LODIGIANO (LO) / IT | 06 /
QUARONI, Marco c/o OLON S.p.A. Via Livelli, 1 - Fraz. Mairano 26852 CASALETTO LODIGIANO (LO) / IT | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Bianchetti & Minoja with Trevisan & Cuonzo IPS SRL Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 21157188.0 | 25.06.2018 | [2021/29] | Priority number, date | IT20170148330 | 21.12.2017 Original published format: IT201700148330 | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3851429 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07B47/00, C07C255/54, C07F5/02, C07C253/30 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
C07B47/00 (EP,IL,US);
C07C37/02 (IL,US);
C07F5/027 (IL,US);
B01J23/42 (IL,US);
B01J23/44 (IL,US);
B01J27/053 (IL,US);
B01J27/232 (IL,US);
C07C253/30 (EP,IL,US);
C07C255/54 (EP,IL,US);
C07C39/15 (IL,US);
C07C39/205 (IL,US);
C07F5/025 (EP,IL,US);
C07B2200/13 (IL,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C253/30, C07C255/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CRISABOROL | [2021/29] | English: | A PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF CRISABOROLE | [2021/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE CRISABOROLE | [2021/29] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/26] | 11.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/26] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18737823.7 / EP3728167 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CA3023851 (ANACOR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]); | [I]WO2017203514 (PERRIGO API LTD [IL]) | by applicant | WO2006089067 | US2015291629 |