EP4043041 - CXCR4-LIGANDS FOR DIAGNOSTIC AND THERAPEUTIC USE AND PRECURSORS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität München Arcisstr. 21 80333 München / DE | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konrad, Matthias 80939 München / DE | 02 /
Schottelius, Margret 1005 Lausanne / CH | 03 /
Wester, Hans-Jürgen 85301 Schweitenkirchen / DE | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 21157225.0 | 15.02.2021 | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4043041 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/08, A61P35/00, A61K101/02, A61K103/00, A61K103/30 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A61K51/08 (EP);
A61K51/088 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CXCR4-LIGANDEN ZUR DIAGNOSTISCHEN UND THERAPEUTISCHEN VERWENDUNG UND IHRE VORLÄUFER | [2022/33] | English: | CXCR4-LIGANDS FOR DIAGNOSTIC AND THERAPEUTIC USE AND PRECURSORS THEREOF | [2022/33] | French: | CXCR4-LIGANDS POUR USAGE DIAGNOSTIQUE ET THÉRAPEUTIQUE ET LEURS PRÉCURSEURS | [2022/33] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/30] | 13.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2011131735 (UNIV MUENCHEN TECH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]CN102626522B (HAN YANJIANG) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2015185162 (TECH UNIVERSITÄT MÜNCHEN [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XDYI]WO2020053255 (UNIV MUENCHEN TECH [DE]) [XD] 1-5,7-15 * claims 1, 9, 10, 12,13, formula (I)-(III); page 13, line 9 to page 15, line 2; page 59, lines 2ff * [Y] 6 [I] 6; | [A] - Theresa Osl, "Development of cyclic pentapeptide ligands for chemokine receptor targeting", (20170101), URL: http://mediatum.ub.tum.de/doc/1342124/1342124.pdf, XP055626839 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - Osl ET AL, "Elektronische Prüfungsarbeiten", (20180315), URL: http://mediatum.ub.tum.de/print/1342124.pdf, (20190927), XP055626918 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - OSL THERESA ET AL, "A new class of PentixaFor- and PentixaTher-based theranostic agents with enhanced CXCR4-targeting efficiency", THERANOSTICS, AU, vol. 10, no. 18, doi:10.7150/thno.45537, ISSN 1838-7640, (20200101), pages 8264 - 8280, URL: https://www.thno.org/v10p8264.pdf, XP055827484 [Y] 6 * figure 1; paragraph bridging the columns of page 8271 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7150/thno.45537 | by applicant | WO2007096662 | WO2008150689 | WO2009027706 | WO2011131735 | WO2012118124 | US8410059 | US8765683 | WO2015185162 | WO2020053255 | - ZLOTNIKAYOSHIE O, "Chemokines", Immunity, (20000000), vol. 12, pages 121 - 127 | - DOMANSKA UMKRUIZINGA RCNAGENGAST WB et al., "A review on CXCR4/CXCL12 axis in oncology: No place to hide", Eur J Cancer, (20130000), vol. 49, doi:10.1016/j.ejca.2012.05.005, pages 219 - 230, XP002724533 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejca.2012.05.005 | - FENG YBRODER CCKENNEDY PEBERGER EA, "HIV-1 entry cofactor: Functional cDNA cloning of a seven-transmembrane, G protein-coupled receptor", Science, (19960000), vol. 272, doi:10.1126/science.272.5263.872, pages 872 - 877, XP002027999 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.272.5263.872 | - NAGASAWA THIROTA STACHIBANA K et al., "Defects of B-cell lymphopoiesis and bone-marrow myelopoiesis in mice lacking the CXC chemokine PBSF/SDF-1", Nature, (19960000), vol. 382, doi:10.1038/382635a0, pages 635 - 638, XP002115695 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/382635a0 | - "Chemokines and Their Receptors in Lymphocyte Traffic and HIV Infection", LOETSCHER PMOSER BBAGGIOLINI M, Advances in Immunology, Elsevier, (19990000), vol. 74, pages 127 - 180 | - AIUTI AWEBB IJBLEUL CSPRINGER TGUTIERREZ-RAMOS JC, "The chemokine SDF-1 is a chemoattractant for human CD34+ hematopoietic progenitor cells and provides a new mechanism to explain the mobilization of CD34+ progenitors to peripheral blood", J Exp Med, (19970000), vol. 185, doi:10.1084/jem.185.1.111, pages 111 - 120, XP000866066 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.185.1.111 | - BURGER JABURGER MKIPPS TJ, "Chronic lymphocytic leukemia B cells express functional CXCR4 chemokine receptors that mediate spontaneous migration beneath bone marrow stromal cells", Blood, (19990000), vol. 94, pages 3658 - 3667, XP003009551 | - MULLER AHOMEY BSOTO H et al., "Involvement of chemokine receptors in breast cancer metastasis", Nature, (20010000), vol. 410, doi:10.1038/35065016, pages 50 - 56, XP002292390 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35065016 | - BURGER JAKIPPS TJ, "CXCR4: A key receptor in the crosstalk between tumor cells and their microenvironment", Blood, (20060000), vol. 107, doi:10.1182/blood-2005-08-3182, pages 1761 - 1767, XP002465982 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2005-08-3182 | - CHATTERJEE SBEHNAM AZAD BNIMMAGADDA S, "The intricate role of CXCR4 in cancer", Adv Cancer Res, (20140000), vol. 124, doi:10.1016/B978-0-12-411638-2.00002-1, pages 31 - 82, XP055369748 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/B978-0-12-411638-2.00002-1 | - GUO FWANG YLIU JMOK SCXUE FZHANG W, "CXCL12/CXCR4: A symbiotic bridge linking cancer cells and their stromal neighbors in oncogenic communication networks", Oncogene, (20160000), vol. 35, doi:10.1038/onc.2015.139, pages 816 - 826, XP055380594 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/onc.2015.139 | - ORIMO AGUPTA PBSGROI DC et al., "Stromal fibroblasts present in invasive human breast carcinomas promote tumor growth and angiogenesis through elevated SDF-1/CXCL12 secretion", Cell, (20050000), vol. 121, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2005.02.034, pages 335 - 348, XP009138583 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2005.02.034 | - TAMAMURA HXU YHATTORI T et al., "A low-molecular-weight inhibitor against the chemokine receptor CXCR4: A strong anti-HIV peptide T140", Biochem Biophys Res Commun, (19980000), vol. 253, doi:10.1006/bbrc.1998.9871, pages 877 - 882, XP002169961 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1998.9871 | - TAMAMURA HKURODA MMASUDA M et al., "A comparative study of the solution structures of tachyplesin I and a novel anti-HIV synthetic peptide, T22 ([Tyr5,12, Lys7]- polyphemusin II), determined by nuclear magnetic resonance", Biochimica et Biophysics Acta (BBA) - Protein Structure and Molecular Enzymology, (19930000), vol. 1163, doi:10.1016/0167-4838(93)90183-R, pages 209 - 216, XP023469735 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4838(93)90183-R | - TAMAMURA HWAKI MIMAI M et al., "Downsizing of an HIV-cell fusion inhibitor, T22 ([Tyr 5, 12 , Lys 7 ]-Polyphemusin II), with the maintenance of anti-HIV activity and solution structure 1", Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry, (19980000), vol. 6, pages 473 - 479 | - TAMAMURA HHIRAMATSU KMIZUMOTO M et al., "Enhancement of the T140-based pharmacophores leads to the development of more potent and bio-stable CXCR4 antagonists", Org Biomol Chem, (20030000), vol. 1, doi:10.1039/B306613B, pages 3663 - 3669, XP008125665 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B306613B | - GEORGE GPCSTEVENS EABERG O et al., "Preclinical evaluation of a CXCR4-specific (68)Ga-labelled TN14003 derivative for cancer PET imaging", Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry, (20140000), vol. 22, doi:10.1016/j.bmc.2013.12.012, pages 796 - 803, XP028668769 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2013.12.012 | - JACOBSON OWEISS IDKIESEWETTER DOFARBER JMCHEN X, "PET of tumor CXCR4 expression with 4-18F-T140", J Nucl Med, (20100000), vol. 51, doi:10.2967/jnumed.110.079418, pages 1796 - 1804, XP002716818 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2967/jnumed.110.079418 | - YAN XNIU GWANG Z et al., "AI18FNOTA-T140 Peptide for Noninvasive Visualization of CXCR4 Expression", Mol Imaging Biol, (20160000), vol. 18, doi:10.1007/s11307-015-0872-2, pages 135 - 142, XP035936449 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11307-015-0872-2 | - PENG S-BZHANG XPAUL D et al., "Inhibition of CXCR4 by LY2624587, a Fully Humanized Anti-CXCR4 Antibody Induces Apoptosis of Hematologic Malignancies", PLoS ONE, (20160000), vol. 11, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0150585, page e0150585, XP055368885 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0150585 | - PORTELLA LVITALE RLUCA S DE et al., "Preclinical development of a novel class of CXCR4 antagonist impairing solid tumors growth and metastases", PLoS ONE, (20130000), vol. 8, page e74548 | - TSUTSUMI HTANAKA TOHASHI N et al., "Therapeutic potential of the chemokine receptor CXCR4 antagonists as multifunctional agents", Biopolymers, (20070000), vol. 88, doi:10.1002/BIP.20653, pages 279 - 289, XP002629052 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/BIP.20653 | - TAMAMURA HARAKI TUEDA S et al., "Identification of novel low molecular weight CXCR4 antagonists by structural tuning of cyclic tetrapeptide scaffolds", J Med Chem, (20050000), vol. 48, doi:10.1021/jm050009h, pages 3280 - 3289, XP002460443 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm050009h | - TAMAMURA HESAKA AOGAWA T et al., "Structure-activity relationship studies on CXCR4 antagonists having cyclic pentapeptide scaffolds", Org Biomol Chem, (20050000), vol. 3, doi:10.1039/b513145f, pages 4392 - 4394, XP009082932 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b513145f | - TANAKA TNOMURA WNARUMI T et al., "Structure-activity relationship study on artificial CXCR4 ligands possessing the cyclic pentapeptide scaffold: The exploration of amino acid residues of pentapeptides by substitutions of several aromatic amino acids", Org Biomol Chem, (20090000), vol. 7, pages 3805 - 3809 | - NARUMI THAYASHI RTOMITA K et al., "Synthesis and biological evaluation of selective CXCR4 antagonists containing alkene dipeptide isosteres", Org Biomol Chem, (20100000), vol. 8, doi:10.1039/B917236J, pages 616 - 621, XP002668500 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B917236J | - UEDA SOISHI SWANG Z-X et al., "Structure-activity relationships of cyclic peptide-based chemokine receptor CXCR4 antagonists: Disclosing the importance of side-chain and backbone functionalities", J Med Chem, (20070000), vol. 50, doi:10.1021/jm0607350, pages 192 - 198, XP009107403 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0607350 | - WU BCHIEN EYTMOL CD et al., "Structures of the CXCR4 chemokine GPCR with small-molecule and cyclic peptide antagonists", Science, (20100000), vol. 330, doi:10.1126/science.1194396, pages 1066 - 1071, XP055036210 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1194396 | - DEMMER ODIJKGRAAF ISCHUMACHER U et al., "Design, synthesis, and functionalization of dimeric peptides targeting chemokine receptor CXCR4", J Med Chem, (20110000), vol. 54, doi:10.1021/jm2009716, pages 7648 - 7662, XP055052231 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm2009716 | - TANAKA TNOMURA WNARUMI TMASUDA ATAMAMURA H, "Bivalent ligands of CXCR4 with rigid linkers for elucidation of the dimerization state in cells", J Am Chem Soc, (20100000), vol. 132, doi:10.1021/ja107447w, pages 15899 - 15901, XP055524518 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja107447w | - ÁVILA-SÁNCHEZ MFERRO-FLORES GJIMENEZ-MANCILLA N et al., "Synthesis and preclinical evaluation of the 99mTc-/177Lu-CXCR4-L theranostic pair for in vivo chemokine-4 receptor-specific targeting", J Radioanal Nucl Chem, (20200000), vol. 324, doi:10.1007/s10967-020-07043-6, pages 21 - 32, XP037078523 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10967-020-07043-6 | - VALLEJO-ARMENTA PSANTOS-CUEVAS CSOTO-ANDONAEGUI J et al., "99mTc-CXCR4-L for Imaging of the Chemokine-4 Receptor Associated with Brain Tumor Invasiveness: Biokinetics, Radiation Dosimetry, and Proof of Concept in Humans", Contrast Media Mol Imaging, (20200000), page 2525037 | - DEMMER ODIJKGRAAF ISCHOTTELIUS MWESTER H-JKESSLER H, "Introduction of functional groups into peptides via N-alkylation", Org Lett, (20080000), vol. 10, pages 2015 - 2018 | - DEMMER OGOURNI ESCHUMACHER UKESSLER HWESTER H-J, "PET imaging of CXCR4 receptors in cancer by a new optimized ligand", ChemMedChem, (20110000), vol. 6, doi:10.1002/cmdc.201100320, pages 1789 - 1791, XP055544161 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cmdc.201100320 | - GOURNI EDEMMER OSCHOTTELIUS M et al., "PET of CXCR4 expression by a (68)Ga-labeled highly specific targeted contrast agent", J Nucl Med, (20110000), vol. 52, pages 1803 - 1810 | - POSCHENRIEDER ASCHOTTELIUS MSCHWAIGER MKESSLER HWESTER H-J, "The influence of different metal-chelate conjugates of pentixafor on the CXCR4 affinity", EJNMMI Res, (20160000), vol. 6, doi:10.1186/s13550-016-0193-8, page 36, XP055388769 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13550-016-0193-8 | - HERRMANN KSCHOTTELIUS MLAPA C et al., "First-in-Human Experience of CXCR4-Directed Endoradiotherapy with 177Lu- and 90Y-Labeled Pentixather in Advanced-Stage Multiple Myeloma with Extensive Intra- and Extramedullary Disease", J Nucl Med, (20160000), vol. 57, doi:10.2967/jnumed.115.167361, pages 248 - 251, XP055544057 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2967/jnumed.115.167361 | - OSL TSCHMIDT ASCHWAIGER MSCHOTTELIUS MWESTER H-J, "A new class of PentixaFor-and PentixaTher-based theranostic agents with enhanced CXCR4-targeting efficiency", Theranostics, (20200000), vol. 10, pages 8264 - 8280 | - SCHOTTELIUS MKONRAD MOSL TPOSCHENRIEDER AWESTER H-J, "An optimized strategy for the mild and efficient solution phase iodination of tyrosine residues in bioactive peptides", Tetrahedron Letters, (20150000), vol. 56, doi:10.1016/j.tetlet.2015.10.032, pages 6602 - 6605, XP029321717 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2015.10.032 | - DEMMER OFRANK AOHAGN F et al., "Erhohte CXCR4-Affinitat und Anti-HIV-Aktivitat eines Peptoids durch Konformationsfixierung", Angew. Chem., (20120000), vol. 124, pages 8234 - 8237 | - CHATTERJEE JGILON CHOFFMAN AKESSLER H, "N-methylation of peptides: A new perspective in medicinal chemistry", Acc Chem Res, (20080000), vol. 41, doi:10.1021/ar8000603, pages 1331 - 1342, XP055164292 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ar8000603 | - WEINEISEN MSIMECEK JSCHOTTELIUS MSCHWAIGER MWESTER H-J, "Synthesis and preclinical evaluation of DOTAGA-conjugated PSMA ligands for functional imaging and endoradiotherapy of prostate cancer", EJNMMI Res, (20140000), vol. 4, doi:10.1186/s13550-014-0063-1, page 63, XP055753565 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13550-014-0063-1 | - LOVKOVA LWANGLER BSCHIRRMACHER E et al., "para-Functionalized aryl-di-tert-butylfluorosilanes as potential labeling synthons for (18)F radiopharmaceuticals", Chemistry, (20090000), vol. 15, doi:10.1002/chem.200802266, pages 2140 - 2147, XP055071336 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.200802266 | - KOSTIKOV APLOVKOVA LCHIN J et al., "N-(4-(di-tert-butyl[18F]fluorosilyl)benzyl)-2-hydroxy-N,N-dimethylethylammonium bromide ([18F]SiFAN+Br-): A novel lead compound for the development of hydrophilic SiFA-based prosthetic groups for 18F-labeling", Journal of Fluorine Chemistry, (20110000), vol. 132, pages 27 - 34, XP027576116 | - ABRAMS MJJUWEID MTENKATE CI et al., "Technetium-99m-human polyclonal IgG radiolabeled via the hydrazino nicotinamide derivative for imaging focal sites of infection in rats", J Nucl Med, (19900000), vol. 31, pages 2022 - 2028, XP000164904 | - JOYARD YBISCHOFF LLEVACHER VPAPAMICAEL CVERA PBOHN P, "Synthesis and Stability Evaluation of New HYNIC Derivatives as Ligands for Technetium-99m", LOC, (20140000), vol. 11, pages 208 - 214 | - SCHOTTELIUS MSCHWAIGER MWESTER H-J, "Rapid and high-yield solution-phase synthesis of DOTA-Tyr3-octreotide and DOTA-Tyr3-octreotate using unprotected DOTA", Tetrahedron Letters, (20030000), vol. 44, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(03)00221-1, pages 2393 - 2396, XP004411178 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(03)00221-1 | - SCHOTTELIUS MOSL TPOSCHENRIEDER A et al., "177Lupentixather: Comprehensive Preclinical Characterization of a First CXCR4-directed Endoradiotherapeutic Agent", Theranostics, (20170000), vol. 7, doi:10.7150/thno.19119, pages 2350 - 2362, XP055544221 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7150/thno.19119 | - ROBU SSCHOTTELIUS MEIBER M et al., "Preclinical Evaluation and First Patient Application of 99mTc-PSMA-I&S for SPECT Imaging and Radioguided Surgery in Prostate Cancer", J Nucl Med, (20170000), vol. 58, doi:10.2967/jnumed.116.178939, pages 235 - 242, XP055774139 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2967/jnumed.116.178939 | - KUZMANOVSKA SVASKOVA OZDRAVESKA KOCOVSKA M, "In-house'' preparation of 99mTc-EDDA/HYNIC-TOC, a specific targeting agent for somatostatin receptor scintigraphy", Maced. Pharm. Bull., (20110000), vol. 57, pages 65 - 70 | - WANGLER CNIEDERMOSER SCHIN J et al., "One-step (18)F-labeling of peptides for positron emission tomography imaging using the SiFA methodology", Nat Protoc, (20120000), vol. 7, doi:10.1038/nprot.2012.109, pages 1946 - 1955, XP037298690 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2012.109 | - OTHMAN MFBMITRY NRLEWINGTON VJBLOWER PJTERRY SYA, "Re-assessing gallium-67 as a therapeutic radionuclide", Nucl Med Biol, (20170000), vol. 46, doi:10.1016/j.nucmedbio.2016.10.008, pages 12 - 18, XP029900122 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nucmedbio.2016.10.008 | - YAMAZAKI KKANAOKA M, "Computational prediction of the plasma protein-binding percent of diverse pharmaceutical compounds", J Pharm Sci, (20040000), vol. 93, pages 1480 - 1494 |