EP3883335 - RADIO RESOURCE CONTROL RRC MESSAGE PROCESSING METHOD, APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Bo Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 21157369.6 | 23.10.2014 | [2021/38] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3883335 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/08, H04W92/16, H04W88/12, H04W36/08, // H04W92/04, H04W92/12 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
H04W36/08 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04W36/0061 (RU,US);
H04W92/02 (KR);
H04W76/27 (RU,US);
H04W64/00 (RU,US);
H04W76/19 (RU,US);
H04W88/08 (RU,US);
H04W88/12 (KR);
H04L49/201 (US);
H04W88/02 (US);
H04W92/045 (EP,US);
H04W92/12 (EP,US);
H04W92/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON FUNKBETRIEBSMITTELSTEUERUNGSNACHRICHTEN | [2021/38] | English: | RADIO RESOURCE CONTROL RRC MESSAGE PROCESSING METHOD, APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM | [2021/38] | French: | SYSTÈME, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE MESSAGE DE COMMANDE DE RESSOURCE RADIO (RRC) | [2021/38] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 28.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14904298.8 / EP3203805 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011188408 (YI SEUNG-JUNE [KR], et al); | [Y]EP2683183 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); |