EP3879888 - MANAGING POWER USAGE OF A MULTI LINK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANGANATH, Ashok 110 Los Patios Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | 02 /
NARIBOLE, Sharan 4337 Renaissance Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 03 /
KANDALA, Srinivas 18833 White Moon Drive Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | 04 /
LEE, Wook Bong 148 Agustin Narvaez St. San Jose, CA 95136 / US | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 21157372.0 | 16.02.2021 | [2021/37] | Priority number, date | US202062989422P | 13.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062989422 P | US202117159760 | 27.01.2021 Original published format: US202117159760 | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3879888 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, // H04L29/06 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
H04W52/0209 (EP);
H04W52/0258 (KR);
H04W52/0203 (CN);
H04W52/0222 (US);
H04W28/0221 (KR);
H04W52/0235 (US);
H04W52/0261 (KR);
H04W52/028 (EP);
H04W52/0283 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] |
Former [2021/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG DES STROMVERBRAUCHS EINES MULTI LINK-GERÄTS | [2021/37] | English: | MANAGING POWER USAGE OF A MULTI LINK DEVICE | [2021/37] | French: | GESTION DE CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE D'UN APPAREIL MULTI-LINK | [2021/37] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 31.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0615364 (AT & T GLOBAL INF SOLUTION [US]) [A] 1-15* page 3, column l, line 54 - column r, line 42 *; | [A]WO2013008989 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0053]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP3291611 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0093]; figures 1,2 *; | [I]US2019297571 (JOSE PRADEEP [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0064]; figures 3,4 * |