EP3855598 - ENERGY TRANSFER CONTROL ADAPTED TO A MEDICAL DEVICE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Implantica Patent Ltd. Ideon Science Park 223 70 Lund / SE | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Forsell, Peter c/o Implantica Patent Ltd Ideon Science Park 223 70 Lund / SE | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2023/23] |
Former [2021/30] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 21157616.0 | 27.11.2008 | [2021/30] | Priority number, date | US20070996601P | 27.11.2007 Original published format: US 996601 P | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3855598 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3855598 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/12, A61N1/378, A61F2/02, A61N1/36, A61N1/372, H02J7/00, // H02J7/02 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
A61N1/3787 (EP,US);
A61N1/36125 (EP,US);
A61N1/37211 (EP,US);
H02J7/00034 (EP,US);
H02J2310/23 (EP);
H02J50/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2022/10] |
Former [2021/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AN EIN MEDIZINISCHES GERÄTESYSTEM ANGEPASSTE ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNGSSTEUERUNG | [2021/30] | English: | ENERGY TRANSFER CONTROL ADAPTED TO A MEDICAL DEVICE SYSTEM | [2021/30] | French: | RÉGULATION DE TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE POUR SYSTÈME DE DISPOSITIF MEDICAL | [2021/30] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 28.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08853718.8 / EP2214780 | Divisional application(s) | EP23176296.4 / EP4283825 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5702431 (WANG XINTAO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4c,5,7 * * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 12; figure 5 * * column 8, line 8 - column 10, line 61 *; | [A]US6442434 (ZARINETCHI FARHAD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 9, line 34 - column 11, line 7 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US6772011 (DOLGIN ALEXANDER [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 7, lines 22-38 * * figures 1,3,4 * * column 8, lines 37-46 * * figure 7 *; | [A]US2007156204 (DENKER STEPHEN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 3 * * paragraphs [0036] - [0041] * * figure 5 *; | [E]WO2009051536 (MILUX HOLDING SA [LU], et al) [E] 1-15 * page 13, line 16 - page 14, line 7 * * page 18, lines 12-19 * * page 37, line 28 - page 38, line 16 * * page 46, lines 4-7 * * claims 116,121,173 * * figure 17b *; | EP2214779 [ ] (MILUX HOLDING SA [LU]) | by applicant | US5995874 |