Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3901341 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380060093 CN201510514862 EP13818039 EP16194437 EP20177242 EP21157987 JP2015543104 JP2017091560 KR20157016174 US201213681766

More

US2013070648W US201615293829 US201916555364 US202016792536 US202217737380



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2022256973Global Dossier 18.08.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202217737380 05.05.2022
US202016792536 17.02.2020
US201615293829 14.10.2016
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11363854Global Dossier 21.06.2022B2
US2020178650 11.06.2020A1
Priority number Date
US202016792536 17.02.2020
US201615293829 14.10.2016
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11129443Global Dossier 28.09.2021B2
US2019380442 19.12.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201916555364 29.08.2019
US201615293829 14.10.2016
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10561200Global Dossier 18.02.2020B2
US2017027284 02.02.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615293829 14.10.2016
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101821025BGlobal Dossier 22.01.2018B1
KR20150086520 28.07.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013US70648 19.11.2013
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6245482BGlobal Dossier 13.12.2017B2
JP2015535443 14.12.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013US70648 19.11.2013
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3725180Global Dossier 02.06.2021B1
EP3725180 21.10.2020A1
Priority number Date
EP13818039 19.11.2013
WO2013US70648 19.11.2013
EP16194437 19.11.2013
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3143894Global Dossier 15.07.2020B1
EP3143894 22.03.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP13818039 19.11.2013
WO2013US70648 19.11.2013
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2922435Global Dossier 02.11.2016B1
EP2922435 30.09.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013US70648 19.11.2013
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105167306BGlobal Dossier 12.04.2017B
CN105167306 23.12.2015A
Priority number Date
CN201380060093 19.11.2013
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104797153BGlobal Dossier 24.08.2016B
CN104797153 22.07.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013US70648 19.11.2013
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3901341Global Dossier 27.10.2021A1
Priority number Date
EP13818039 19.11.2013
EP20177242 19.11.2013
WO2013US70648 19.11.2013
EP16194437 19.11.2013
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112015011517 06.10.2020B1
BR112015011517 11.07.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2013US70648 19.11.2013
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1211445 27.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2013US70648 19.11.2013
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014081679Global Dossier 30.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9498023Global Dossier 22.11.2016B2
US2014137434 22.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6607611BGlobal Dossier 20.11.2019B2
JP2017131728 03.08.2017A
Priority number Date
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1219212 31.03.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201213681766 20.11.2012
TypeType Earlier application
 EP2922435
 EP3143894
 EP3725180