EP3875162 - TOY ASSEMBLY WITH INNER OBJECT IN HOUSING THAT PERFORMS FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spin Master Ltd. 225 King Street West, Suite 200 Toronto, Ontario M5V 3M2 / CA | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gamble, Lee c/o Spin Master Ltd. 225 King St. West Suite 200 Toronto, Ontario M5V 3M2 / CA | 02 /
Lentini, Matthew c/o Spin Master Ltd. 225 King St. West Suite 200 Toronto, Ontario M5V 3M2 / CA | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Loo, Chi Ching, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 3BA / GB | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 21158413.1 | 22.02.2021 | [2021/36] | Priority number, date | US202062980140P | 21.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062980140 P | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875162 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3875162 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A63H3/50, A63H3/18, A63H13/02, A63H29/22, A63H17/26 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
A63H3/50 (EP);
A63H33/00 (CN);
A63H29/24 (US);
A63H13/02 (EP);
A63H17/26 (EP);
A63H17/262 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] |
Former [2021/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPIELZEUGANORDNUNG MIT EINEM INNEREN OBJEKT IN EINEM GEHÄUSE ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG EINER FUNKTION | [2021/36] | English: | TOY ASSEMBLY WITH INNER OBJECT IN HOUSING THAT PERFORMS FUNCTION | [2021/36] | French: | ENSEMBLE JOUETS AVEC OBJET INTÉRIEUR DANS LE BOÎTIER REMPLISSANT LA FONCTION | [2021/36] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 08.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23215351.0 / EP4344759 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2023 | CZ | 27.12.2023 | EE | 27.12.2023 | FI | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | LT | 27.12.2023 | LV | 27.12.2023 | NL | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SE | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | BG | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | PT | 29.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 27.12.2023 | |
CZ | 27.12.2023 | ||
EE | 27.12.2023 | ||
FI | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
LV | 27.12.2023 | ||
NL | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SE | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 27.12.2023 | |
LT | 27.12.2023 | ||
BG | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4259805 (HORNSBY JR J RUSSELL); | [A]GB2367766 (GENIE TOYS PLC [GB]); | [A]US2002098770 (MESCH THOMAS J [US]); | [A]US2007173172 (YU SUN [US], et al); | [A]EP3488907 (SPIN MASTER LTD [CA]) | by applicant | US9950267 |