EP4050602 - CONFERENCE DEVICE WITH VOICE DIRECTION ESTIMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GN Audio A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2024/40] |
Former [2022/35] | For all designated states GN Audio A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSSON, Rasmus Kongsgaard 2750 Ballerup / DK | 02 /
FUGLSANG, Thomas DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | GN Store Nord A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2024/40] |
Former [2022/35] | Aera A/S Niels Hemmingsens Gade 10, 5th Floor 1153 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 21159077.3 | 24.02.2021 | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050602 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4050602 | Date: | 02.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G10L25/18, G10L21/028 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
G10L25/18 (EP,US);
H04N7/15 (CN);
H04R3/005 (US);
G01S3/802 (CN);
G06N3/08 (CN,US);
G10L21/028 (EP);
G10L25/30 (US);
G10L25/78 (US);
H04L65/1089 (US);
H04L65/403 (US);
H04M3/568 (US);
H04R1/406 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] |
Former [2022/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KONFERENZVORRICHTUNG MIT SPRACHRICHTUNGSSCHÄTZUNG | [2022/35] | English: | CONFERENCE DEVICE WITH VOICE DIRECTION ESTIMATION | [2022/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONFÉRENCE AVEC ESTIMATION DE LA DIRECTION VOCALE | [2022/35] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 23.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9972339 (SUNDARAM SHIVA KUMAR [US]); | [XAI]WO2020250797 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [XAI]CN112185413 (BEIJING SOGOU TECH DEV CO); |