EP3879404 - PLATFORM FOR AUTOMATED ADMINISTRATION AND MONITORING OF IN-MEMORY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP SE Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMULU, James Michael c/o SAP SE Global IP Group Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | 02 /
C K, Biddappa c/o SAP SE Global IP Group Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | 03 /
KALUTI, Deepak c/o SAP SE Global IP Group Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | 04 /
VIJAYAKRISHNAN, Vishnu c/o SAP SE Global IP Group Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 21159263.9 | 25.02.2021 | [2021/37] | Priority number, date | US202016813934 | 10.03.2020 Original published format: US202016813934 | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3879404 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/07 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
G06F11/0778 (EP);
G06F11/3034 (CN);
G06F11/0793 (EP,US);
G06F11/0709 (US);
G06F11/073 (EP);
G06F11/0751 (US);
G06F11/0766 (US);
G06F11/16 (US);
G06F11/3051 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] |
Former [2021/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLATTFORM FÜR DIE AUTOMATISIERTE VERWALTUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG VON SYSTEMEN IN EINEM SPEICHER | [2021/37] | English: | PLATFORM FOR AUTOMATED ADMINISTRATION AND MONITORING OF IN-MEMORY SYSTEMS | [2021/37] | French: | PLATEFORME D'ADMINISTRATION AUTOMATIQUE ET DE SURVEILLANCE DE SYSTÈMES DE MÉMOIRE | [2021/37] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 03.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017228273 (BIKUMALA SATISH KUMAR [US]) [Y] 5,10,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0019] ** claims 1,7,10,15 *; | [IY]US2019087251 (PURUSHOTHAMAN SASIDHAR [IN]) [I] 1-4,6-9,11-14 * the whole document * [Y] 5,10,15 |