02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
13.10.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
10.10.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.10.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.10.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.07.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.07.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] |
07.07.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] |
24.02.2023 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
24.02.2023 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] |
24.02.2023 |
Change - designated states |
published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] |
17.02.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
26.02.2021 |
Change - representative |
|