blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4050319

EP4050319 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ISOKINETIC EXTRACTION OF A SAMPLE FROM A FLOWING AEROSOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.04.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.03.2023
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  29.07.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2025Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR, NO
published on 28.05.2025 [2025/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Al Shabu, Atef
Kapellenfeld 7
96274 Itzgrund / DE
[2023/19]
Former [2022/35]For all designated states
Al Shabu, Atef
Balthasar-Schönfelder-Str. 16A
91301 Forchheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2022/35]
Representative(s)Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB
Wetterkreuz 3
91058 Erlangen / DE
[2022/35]
Application number, filing date21159363.725.02.2021
[2022/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4050319
Date:31.08.2022
Language:DE
[2022/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4050319
Date:09.10.2024
Language:DE
[2024/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2021
ClassificationIPC:G01N1/22, // G01N15/02
[2022/35]
CPC:
G01N1/2247 (EP); G01N2001/225 (EP); G01N2015/0261 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/14]  
Former [2022/35]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ISOKINETISCHEN ENTNAHME EINER PROBE AUS EINEM STRÖMENDEN AEROSOL[2022/35]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ISOKINETIC EXTRACTION OF A SAMPLE FROM A FLOWING AEROSOL[2022/35]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉLÈVEMENT ISOCINÉTIQUE D'UN ÉCHANTILLON À PARTIR D'UN AÉROSOL EN ÉCOULEMENT[2022/35]
Examination procedure28.02.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.02.2023Examination requested  [2023/14]
28.02.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.04.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2024Fee for grant paid
27.08.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.08.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES09.10.2024
HR09.10.2024
NO09.01.2025
GR10.01.2025
IS09.02.2025
[2025/22]
Former [2025/21]ES09.10.2024
HR09.10.2024
IS09.02.2025
Documents cited:Search[YA]US4159635  (SEHMEL GEORGE A);
 [YA]DE3318339  (WURZ DIETER)
ExaminationUS2005087028
 US6904815
by applicantUS2982131
 EP0561557
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.