EP3872099 - PURIFIED POLYMER AND METHODS FOR MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kraton Polymers Research B.V. Asterweg 19A1 1031 HL Amsterdam / NL | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRIGHT, Kathryn c/o Kraton Polymers LLC 16400 Park Row Houston, Texas 77084 / US | 02 /
MHETAR, Vijay c/o Kraton Polymers LLC 16400 Park Row Houston, Texas 77084 / US | 03 /
KRUTZER, Bert c/o Kraton Polymers LLC 16400 Park Row Houston, Texas 77084 / US | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 21159509.5 | 26.02.2021 | [2021/35] | Priority number, date | US202062981561P | 26.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062981561 P | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3872099 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08F6/00, C08L71/12 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
C08F6/005 (EP);
C08F6/28 (US);
C08F118/08 (US);
C08F293/00 (US);
C08G65/38 (US);
Y02P20/54 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F6/005, C08L25/04 (EP);
C08F6/005, C08L31/04 (EP);
C08F6/005, C08L55/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] |
Former [2021/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEREINIGTES POLYMER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2021/35] | English: | PURIFIED POLYMER AND METHODS FOR MAKING | [2021/35] | French: | POLYMÈRE PURIFIÉ ET SES PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2021/35] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 28.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 12.10.2022 | [2022/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0447177 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * claim 10 *; | [X]GB2245273 (TOYO ENGINEERING CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * examples 1-2; claims 1-16 *; | [X]US2004092406 (OSAWA YOSHIHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1-15* paragraphs [0032] , [0042] , [0087]; example 2 *; | [X]JP2005139306 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-15 * example 1 *; | [X]CN101654515 (CHENGDU ORGANIC CHEMICALS CO) [X] 1-15 * embodiment 1 * |