EP4050228 - BEARING BUSH FOR A ROTATING SHAFT, BEARING PLATE, ELECTRIC MOTOR AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A DAMPING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuh, Carsten 85598 Baldham / DE | 02 /
Soller, Thomas 94469 Deggendorf / DE | 03 /
Vollmer, Rolf 36129 Gersfeld / DE | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21159605.1 | 26.02.2021 | [2022/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050228 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4050228 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16C17/02, F16C33/14, B33Y10/00, B33Y80/00, F16F7/01, B32B15/01 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
F16C17/02 (EP,US);
H02K5/161 (CN);
F16C33/208 (US);
B22F10/10 (US);
B22F10/12 (EP);
B22F5/10 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
C22C38/00 (EP);
F16C33/14 (EP);
F16F7/00 (US);
F16F7/01 (EP);
H02K5/14 (US);
H02K5/24 (CN);
F16C2220/24 (EP);
F16C2240/44 (EP);
F16C2240/60 (EP);
F16C2240/90 (EP);
H02K2213/03 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LAGERBUCHSE FÜR EINE ROTIERENDE WELLE, LAGERSCHILD, ELEKTROMOTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DÄMPFUNGSELEMENTES | [2022/35] | English: | BEARING BUSH FOR A ROTATING SHAFT, BEARING PLATE, ELECTRIC MOTOR AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A DAMPING ELEMENT | [2022/35] | French: | COUSSINET DE PALIER POUR UN ARBRE ROTATIF, FLASQUE, MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT D'AMORTISSEMENT | [2022/35] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 19.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | ES | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | NL | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 31.05.2023 | |
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 31.05.2023 | |
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 31.05.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004170459 (TAYLOR CHARLES S [US], et al) [A] 12-15 * [0012],[0013],[0016],[0056] *; | [A]DE102010063725 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0013]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2017002858 (HUNTER ALAN F [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]JP2019015369 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [A] 1-15* [0002]; paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * |