EP3876657 - COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aio, Kosuke c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo, 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
MA, Yuelin c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo, 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
Morioka, Yuichi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo, 1080075 / JP | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 21159998.0 | 22.08.2017 | [2021/36] | Priority number, date | JP20160215482 | 02.11.2016 Original published format: JP 2016215482 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876657 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3876657 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04W84/12 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
H04W74/08 (EP);
H04W74/0808 (EP,KR);
H04W74/085 (KR);
H04W84/12 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2021/36] | English: | COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2021/36] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2021/36] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 24.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17867284.6 / EP3537836 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | IT | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009274167 (YAMAZAKI JUNYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0063]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0080]; figure 8 *; | [A]US2012163218 (KIM YONG SUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0119]; figure 5 *; | [A]US2016066257 (LIU JIANHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011]; figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0040]; figure 8 *; | [A] - BO LI (NORTHWESTERN POLYTECHNICAL UNIVERSITY), "Fractional-Backoff Procedure and Dynamic CCA", vol. 802.11ax, (20160512), pages 1 - 9, IEEE DRAFT; 11-16-0589-00-00AX-FRACTIONAL-BACKOFF-PROCEDURE-AND-DYNAMIC-CCA, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, URL: https://mentor.ieee.org/802.11/dcn/16/11-16-0589-00-00ax-fractional-backoff-procedure-and-dynamic-cca.pptx, (20160512), XP068119399 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - GRAHAM SMITH (SR TECHNOLOGIES), "Unified SR approach DSC, ATPC and Inter-BSS ; 11-16-1064-03-00ax-unified-sr-approach-dsc-atpc-and-inter-bss", vol. 802.11ax, no. 3, (20160930), pages 1 - 14, IEEE DRAFT; 11-16-1064-03-00AX-UNIFIED-SR-APPROACH-DSC-ATPC-AND-INTER-BSS, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, URL: https://mentor.ieee.org/802.11/dcn/16/11-16-1064-03-00ax-unified-sr-approach-dsc-atpc-and-inter-bss.pptx, (20160930), XP068110636 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2013179555 |