Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11765051 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2023 | B2 | US2022006708 | 06.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117377225 | 15.07.2021 | US201762553637 | 01.09.2017 | US201815878318 | 23.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3475856 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2021 | B1 | EP3475856 | 18.09.2019 | A4 | EP3475856 | 01.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN103457 | 31.08.2018 | US201762553637 | 01.09.2017 | US201815878318 | 23.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117170892 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN103457 | 31.08.2018 | US201762553637 | 01.09.2017 | US201815878318 | 23.01.2018 | CN201880056974 | 31.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111052086B | Global Dossier | 10.11.2023 | B | CN111052086 | 21.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN103457 | 31.08.2018 | US201762553637 | 01.09.2017 | US201815878318 | 23.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3848805 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN103457 | 31.08.2018 | US201762553637 | 01.09.2017 | US201815878318 | 23.01.2018 | EP18804218 | 31.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019042395 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762553637 | 01.09.2017 | US201815878318 | 23.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11088926 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2021 | B2 | US2019075154 | 07.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762553637 | 01.09.2017 | US201815878318 | 23.01.2018 | Type | Earlier application | EP3475856 |