EP4053593 - PROCESSING OF SENSOR DATA IN A MEANS OF TRANSPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elektrobit Automotive GmbH Am Wolfsmantel 46 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hermann, Stefan 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Intellectual Property Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt a. Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/36] | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG Intellectual Property Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt a. Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 21160378.2 | 03.03.2021 | [2022/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053593 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/86, G01S13/931, G01S15/86, G01S15/931, G01S17/86, G01S17/931, G01S7/41 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
G01S13/867 (EP);
G01S13/931 (EP);
G01S15/86 (EP);
G01S15/931 (EP);
G01S17/86 (EP);
G01S17/931 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNG VON SENSORDATEN IN EINEM FORTBEWEGUNGSMITTEL | [2022/36] | English: | PROCESSING OF SENSOR DATA IN A MEANS OF TRANSPORT | [2022/36] | French: | TRAITEMENT DES DONNÉES DE CAPTEUR DANS UN MOYEN DE TRANSPORT | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/36] | 18.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6414712 (WANIELIK GERD [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * the whole document * [I] 8; | [XI]JP2011145166 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-7,9,10 * paragraphs [0019] - [0023]; figures 1,4,6 * [I] 8; | [XI]WO2018115917 (TOYOTA MOTOR EUROPE [BE], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0075] - [0084] - [0089] - [0091]; figures 1,2,4 *[I] 8 | by applicant | DE102013113054 | DE102016104463 |