EP4053871 - A MEDIUM VOLTAGE SWITCHING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morelli, Emanuele I-24052 Azzano San Paolo (BG) / IT | 02 /
Bruni, Jacopo I-26853 Caselle Lurani (LO) / IT | 03 /
Rizzi, Corrado I-24040 Fornovo S. Giovanni (BG) / IT | 04 /
Forlani, Giorgio I-24058 Romano di Lombardia (BG) / IT | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | De Bortoli, Eros, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.p.A. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 21160404.6 | 03.03.2021 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053871 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4053871 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/30, H01H3/42, H01H31/00, H01H33/666 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H01H3/3047 (EP);
H01H33/66 (CN);
H01H33/6661 (EP,CN,US);
H01H3/42 (EP,CN);
H01H31/003 (EP);
H01H33/122 (US);
H01H33/6606 (CN);
H01H33/664 (CN);
H01H33/6664 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] |
Former [2022/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MITTELSPANNUNGSSCHALTVORRICHTUNG | [2022/36] | English: | A MEDIUM VOLTAGE SWITCHING APPARATUS | [2022/36] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION MOYENNE TENSION | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 17.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2744284 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA [FR]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]WO2006074975 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 10, line 17 - page 15, line 32; figure - *; | [XI]WO2020200864 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-17 * page 14, line 22 - page 21, line 2; figure - * [I] 7 |