EP3854282 - VACUUM CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2024 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CH, IE, SI | published on 28.05.2025 [2025/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Festool GmbH Wertstrasse 20 73240 Wendlingen am Neckar / DE | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caspar, Moritz Haußmannstraße 120 70188 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Neckarstraße 47 73728 Esslingen / DE | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 21160878.1 | 07.06.2018 | [2021/30] | Priority number, date | DE201710112708 | 08.06.2017 Original published format: DE102017112708 | DE201710131459 | 29.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017131459 | [2021/30] | Previously filed application, date | WO2018EP65100 | 07.06.2018 | [2021/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3854282 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3854282 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47L7/00, A47L5/36, A47L9/28, A47L9/24 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
A47L7/0095 (EP,KR,US);
A47L5/362 (US);
A47L5/365 (EP,KR);
A47L9/248 (EP,KR,US);
A47L9/2805 (US);
A47L9/2842 (EP,KR,US);
A47L9/2894 (EP,KR,US);
B23Q11/0046 (EP,KR,US);
B25F5/00 (EP,KR);
B25F5/02 (US);
G08C17/00 (US);
H02J13/00 (US);
H04W8/24 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] |
Former [2021/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STAUBSAUGER | [2021/30] | English: | VACUUM CLEANER | [2021/30] | French: | ASPIRATEUR | [2021/30] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 05.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the invitation to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability not received in time | 08.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18731029.7 / EP3634192 | Divisional application(s) | EP23212209.3 / EP4306023 | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability | 22.04.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 10.01.2024 | CZ | 10.01.2024 | DK | 10.01.2024 | EE | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | MC | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | RO | 10.01.2024 | SE | 10.01.2024 | SI | 10.01.2024 | SK | 10.01.2024 | SM | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | IE | 07.06.2024 | LU | 07.06.2024 | BE | 30.06.2024 | CH | 30.06.2024 | [2025/22] |
Former [2025/13] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
CZ | 10.01.2024 | ||
DK | 10.01.2024 | ||
EE | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
MC | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
RO | 10.01.2024 | ||
SE | 10.01.2024 | ||
SK | 10.01.2024 | ||
SM | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
LU | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2025/11] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
CZ | 10.01.2024 | ||
DK | 10.01.2024 | ||
EE | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
MC | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
RO | 10.01.2024 | ||
SE | 10.01.2024 | ||
SK | 10.01.2024 | ||
SM | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/49] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
CZ | 10.01.2024 | ||
DK | 10.01.2024 | ||
EE | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
RO | 10.01.2024 | ||
SE | 10.01.2024 | ||
SK | 10.01.2024 | ||
SM | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/48] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
CZ | 10.01.2024 | ||
DK | 10.01.2024 | ||
EE | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
SE | 10.01.2024 | ||
SM | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/47] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
DK | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
SE | 10.01.2024 | ||
SM | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/37] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
SE | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 10.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1391263 (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1,4,6 *; | [A]US2009241283 (LOVELESS MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0032]; figure 5; claim 38 *; | [AD]DE102012003073 (FESTOOL GROUP GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0072]; figure 1 * | Examination | EP1297777 | EP1391263 | US2008022479 | US2010199453 | DE102010040336 | DE102013222313 |