EP3848580 - HANDHELD HIGH-PRESSURE CLEANING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Positec Power Tools (Suzhou) Co., Ltd No. 18 Dongwang Road Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Pinghua No. 18 Dongwang Road Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 02 /
QIAO, Yong No. 18 Dongwang Road Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Haijun No. 18 Dongwang Road Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 21160898.9 | 21.11.2016 | [2021/28] | Priority number, date | CN201510810513 | 20.11.2015 Original published format: CN201510810513 | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848580 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F04B19/22, F04B1/16, F04C18/07, F04C18/077, F04B17/03, F04B17/06, F04B53/06, F04B53/14 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
F04B53/144 (EP,US);
F04B9/02 (CN);
F04B1/16 (EP,US);
B05B9/0413 (EP);
B08B3/026 (CN,US);
F04B17/03 (EP,US);
F04B17/06 (EP,US);
F04B19/22 (EP,US);
F04B53/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Title | German: | HANDGEHALTENE HOCHDRUCKREINIGUNGSMASCHINE | [2021/28] | English: | HANDHELD HIGH-PRESSURE CLEANING MACHINE | [2021/28] | French: | MACHINE DE NETTOYAGE HAUTE PRESSION PORTABLE | [2021/28] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 18.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16865808.6 / EP3379081 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 18.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 18.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4162037 (KOYAMA MASAYA [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 46; figure - *; | [Y]US2006013709 (HUDSON WILLIAM A [US], et al) [Y] 2-15 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0025] , [0035]; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]DE102004049630 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO KG ALFRED [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004]; figure 1; claim - *; | [A]CN200999036Y (KEYOU JIN [CN]) [A] 1-13* figure - *; | [Y] - Zipper Maschinen Gmbh, "EN USER MANUAL Akku Garden Sprayer", (20150714), pages 1 - 54, URL: https://www.zipper-maschinen.at/_import/dokumente/zipper/anleitungen/Manual_ZI-DS2V-AKKU_DE_EN_FR_SL.pdf, (20210317), XP055786946 [Y] 1-15 * pages 44-45 * | by applicant | CN1212899C | CN1840246 |