Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023391166 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21160970 | 05.03.2021 | WO2022CN78739 | 02.03.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117157224 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP21160970 | 05.03.2021 | WO2022CN78739 | 02.03.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022184083 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21160970 | 05.03.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4052937 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21160970 | 05.03.2021 |