EP3958188 - COMPACT SILICON QUBIT CELL WITH EMBEDDED READOUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quantum Motion Technologies Limited 9 Sterling Way London, United Kingdom N7 9HJ / GB | [2023/29] |
Former [2022/08] | For all designated states Quantum Motion Technologies Limited Windsor House Cornwall Road Harrogate HG1 2PW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONZALEZ-ZALBA, Miguel Fernando Harrogate, Yorkshire HG1 2PW / GB | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 21161175.1 | 08.03.2021 | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958188 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3958188 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3958188 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06N10/40 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
G06N10/40 (EP,KR,US);
G01R21/00 (US);
H01P7/08 (US);
H03K17/92 (US);
H10N60/01 (US);
H10N60/11 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/08] | G06N10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | KOMPAKTE SILIZIUM-QUBIT-ZELLE MIT EINGEBETTETEM AUSLESEN | [2022/08] | English: | COMPACT SILICON QUBIT CELL WITH EMBEDDED READOUT | [2022/08] | French: | CELLULE COMPACTE À BITS QUANTIQUES EN SILICIUM AVEC LECTURE INTÉGRÉE | [2022/08] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 09.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2531517 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2020403137 (LAMPERT LESTER [US], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A] - SCHAAL S ET AL, "A CMOS dynamic random access architecture for radio-frequency readout of quantum devices", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20180911), doi:10.1038/S41928-019-0259-5, XP081357515 [A] 1-14 * page 1 - page 7, column l * * Supplementary Material; page 2 - page 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41928-019-0259-5 | [A] - J. GORMAN ET AL, "Charge-Qubit Operation of an Isolated Double Quantum Dot", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, US, (20050801), vol. 95, no. 9, doi:10.1103/PhysRevLett.95.090502, ISSN 0031-9007, XP055540746 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.95.090502 | [A] - FERNANDO GONZALEZ-ZALBA M ET AL, "Paper;A hybrid double-dot in silicon;A hybrid double-dot in silicon", NEW JOURNAL OF PHYSICS, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20120221), vol. 14, no. 2, doi:10.1088/1367-2630/14/2/023050, ISSN 1367-2630, page 23050, XP020218085 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1367-2630/14/2/023050 | by applicant | - SHEARROW et al., Applied Physics Letters, vol. 113, page 212601 | - HAYASHI et al., Journal of Physics: Conference Series, (20140000), vol. 507, page 042015 | - SAMKHARADZE et al., Physical Review Applied, (20160000), vol. 5, page 044004 |